Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 78 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 78 Week
» 11223 Month
» 111008 Year
» 1776384 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1661 m/e 12/1917
Great Central Railway 1325c   12/01/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6325   12/08/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3679   29/11/1946
British Railways 63679 w/e 01/07/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/312/1917
O4/8 (2-8-0)23/11/1957
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E104
Works Number 3705
To Service During 12/1917
Taken into Stock 12/01/1924
Withdrawal Sun 23/05/1965 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Service Life 47 yrs, 5 mths , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping T W Ward (Beighton)

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to T W Ward, Beighton, 7/65

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1917
GOR   Gorton on 16/01/1924
DON   Doncaster on 03/06/1945
IMM   Immingham on 09/12/1945
LNG   Langwith Junction on 18/12/1949
LNG   Langwith Junction w/e 24/12/1949
     Withdrawn on 23/05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IMM Immingham m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction w/e 24/12/1949
WDN   w/e 23/05/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1154)
12/08/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1486)
27/08/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1295)
17/08/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1017)
28/10/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1020)
30/08/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1885)
14/08/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3306)
16/12/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1323)
09/05/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1005)
07/07/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 809)
25/10/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3242)
24/06/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3240)
31/01/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22138)
19/03/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22879)
23/11/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28882)
30/03/1961 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28896)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 29/12/1923 12/01/1924 15 days Light Repair Renumbered to GCR 1325c
 
Gorton Works 23/05/1924 12/08/1924 82 days General Boiler number 1486 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6325
 
Gorton Works 16/05/1927 06/07/1927 52 days General    
Gorton Works 01/06/1929 27/08/1929 88 days General Boiler number 1295 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/07/1931 17/08/1931 38 days General Boiler number 1017 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/09/1933 28/10/1933 43 days General Boiler number 1020 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/07/1935 30/08/1935 36 days General Boiler number 1885 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/07/1937 14/08/1937 20 days General Boiler number 3306 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/09/1937 06/10/1937 22 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 19/11/1939 16/12/1939 28 days General Boiler number 1323 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/04/1942 09/05/1942 21 days General Boiler number 1005 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/06/1944 07/07/1944 36 days General Boiler number 809 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/04/1947 25/10/1947 181 days General Boiler number 3242 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/05/1950 24/06/1950 28 days General Boiler number 3240 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63679
 
Doncaster Works 10/07/1951 18/07/1951 9 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 23/11/1951 08/12/1951 16 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 09/01/1953 31/01/1953 23 days General Boiler number 22138 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/02/1955 19/03/1955 29 days General Boiler number 22879 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/10/1957 23/11/1957 53 days General Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28882 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 11/08/1958 23/08/1958 13 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 02/03/1961 30/03/1961 29 days General Boiler number 28896 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1917 To Service To service as ROD Number 1661
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3705
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
29/12/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/12/1923. Dep: 12/01/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to GCR 1325c
   
12/01/1924 To Stock To GCR stock    
16/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
23/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1924. Dep: 12/08/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1486 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6325
   
16/05/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1927. Dep: 06/07/1927.    
01/06/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1929. Dep: 27/08/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1295 (Diagram 15)
   
11/07/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1931. Dep: 17/08/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1017 (Diagram 15)
   
16/09/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1933. Dep: 28/10/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1020 (Diagram 15)
   
26/07/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1935. Dep: 30/08/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1885 (Diagram 15)
   
26/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1937. Dep: 14/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3306 (Diagram 15)
   
15/09/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/09/1937. Dep: 06/10/1937.    
19/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1939. Dep: 16/12/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1323 (Diagram 15)
   
19/04/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1942. Dep: 09/05/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1005 (Diagram 15)
   
02/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1944. Dep: 07/07/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 809 (Diagram 15)
   
03/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
09/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
29/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3679    
28/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1947. Dep: 25/10/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3242 (Diagram 15)
   
18/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
24/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
28/05/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1950. Dep: 24/06/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3240 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63679
   
10/07/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/07/1951. Dep: 18/07/1951.    
23/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/11/1951. Dep: 08/12/1951.    
09/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1953. Dep: 31/01/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22138 (Diagram 15)
   
19/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1955. Dep: 19/03/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22879 (Diagram 15)
   
02/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1957. Dep: 23/11/1957.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28882 (Diagram 100A)
   
11/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/08/1958. Dep: 23/08/1958.    
02/03/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1961. Dep: 30/03/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28896 (Diagram 100A)
   
23/05/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63679 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev