Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 21 Today
» 929 Yesterday
» 1858 Week
» 13003 Month
» 112788 Year
» 1778164 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1662 m/e 12/1917
London and North Western Railway 2910 m/e 12/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6346   18/07/1924
War Dept. 757   27/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/212/1917
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E104
Works Number 3706
To Service During 12/1917
Taken into Stock 18/07/1924
Withdrawal Sat 27/09/1941 off Thornton Junction (THJ)
Service Life 23 yrs, 9 mths , 28 dys

Disposal

Notes
Notes Renumbered 757 and sent to the Middle East 25/10/41

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1917
91LNWR   (on loan)   12/1919
ROD       08/1921
THJ   Thornton Junction on 18/07/1924
     Withdrawn on 27/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number C1472)
25/02/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number C1473)
13/07/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1276)
29/05/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 814)
21/10/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 866)
27/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1068)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Darlington Works 21/02/1924 18/07/1924 149 days General Rebuilt to class O4/2
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6346
 
Cowlairs Works 1926 12/1926   General Cowlairs data missing
 
Cowlairs Works 1931 28/02/1931   General    
Gorton Works 18/02/1933 25/02/1933 8 days General Boiler number C1473 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/06/1935 13/07/1935 15 days General Boiler number 1276 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/05/1937 29/05/1937 22 days General Boiler number 814 (Diagram 15)
 
Cowlairs Works 1938 14/07/1938   Light Repair    
Gorton Works 14/10/1939 21/10/1939 8 days General Boiler number 866 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/09/1941 27/09/1941 11 days General Boiler number 1068 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 757
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1917 To Service To service as ROD Number 1662
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3706
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/1919 Allocation      
12/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2910    
08/1921 Allocation      
21/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1924. Dep: 18/07/1924.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/2
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6346
   
18/07/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (THJ)    
18/07/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1926. Dep: ?/12/1926.
Work undertaken:
Cowlairs data missing
   
1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1931. Dep: 28/02/1931.    
18/02/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1933. Dep: 25/02/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number C1473 (Diagram 15)
   
29/06/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1935. Dep: 13/07/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1276 (Diagram 15)
   
08/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1937. Dep: 29/05/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 814 (Diagram 15)
   
1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1938. Dep: 14/07/1938.    
14/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1939. Dep: 21/10/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 866 (Diagram 15)
   
17/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1941. Dep: 27/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1068 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 757
   
27/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 757 from Thornton Junction (THJ)    

prev prev