|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 21/04/1928 | 04/08/1928 | 106 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/2 Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6548 |
||
Gorton Works | 01/11/1928 | 02/11/1928 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 18/09/1930 | 25/10/1930 | 38 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 11/02/1933 | 18/02/1933 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1942 (Diagram 15) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 10/07/1933 | 14/07/1933 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 29/02/1936 | 14/03/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1069 (Diagram 15) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 06/05/1936 | 01/07/1936 | 57 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 28/10/1939 | 04/11/1939 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1090 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/04/1942 | 25/04/1942 | 10 days | General | Boiler number 3205 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/06/1944 | 01/07/1944 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 807 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/11/1946 | 21/12/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1280 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3682 |
||
Gorton Works | 04/06/1949 | 25/06/1949 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3385 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63682 |
||
Gorton Works | 19/04/1952 | 10/05/1952 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22269 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/05/1952 | 16/05/1952 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 02/04/1955 | 30/04/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22290 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/03/1959 | 02/03/1959 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1917 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1664 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3708 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
21/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1928. Dep: 04/08/1928. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/2 Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6548 |
||
04/08/1928 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
01/11/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/11/1928. Dep: 02/11/1928. | ||
03/11/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (DFU) | ||
18/09/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1930. Dep: 25/10/1930. | ||
11/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1933. Dep: 18/02/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1942 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/07/1933. Dep: 14/07/1933. | ||
29/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/02/1936. Dep: 14/03/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1069 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/05/1936. Dep: 01/07/1936. | ||
28/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1939. Dep: 04/11/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1090 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1942. Dep: 25/04/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3205 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
17/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1944. Dep: 01/07/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 807 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/09/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
07/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
30/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1946. Dep: 21/12/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1280 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3682 |
||
04/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1949. Dep: 25/06/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3385 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63682 |
||
27/08/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
10/09/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
11/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
08/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) | ||
14/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) | ||
19/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1952. Dep: 10/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22269 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/05/1952. Dep: 16/05/1952. | ||
02/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1955. Dep: 30/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22290 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 02/03/1959. Dep: 02/03/1959. | ||
06/03/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63682 from Sheffield Darnall (41A) |