|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 04/04/1925 | 04/07/1925 | 92 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6495 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/11/1927 | 24/12/1927 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 08/03/1930 | 05/04/1930 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1139 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/11/1932 | 10/12/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1851 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/01/1935 | 09/02/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1210 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/12/1936 | 19/12/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 655 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/01/1939 | 28/01/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3244 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/03/1941 | 15/03/1941 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1256 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/07/1943 | 14/08/1943 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 3229 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/09/1943 | 25/09/1943 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 23/02/1946 | 09/03/1946 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3377 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/04/1948 | 24/04/1948 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1968 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63686 |
||
Gorton Works | 11/02/1950 | 25/02/1950 | 15 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/06/1951 | 28/07/1951 | 43 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 05/04/1952 | 26/04/1952 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22261 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/08/1952 | 30/08/1952 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 22/09/1954 | 30/10/1954 | 39 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 04/05/1957 | 25/05/1957 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22278 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/01/1960 | 30/01/1960 | 29 days | Light Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1668 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3712 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
04/04/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1925. Dep: 04/07/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6495 |
||
02/07/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
04/07/1925 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
17/07/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
08/01/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
12/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1927. Dep: 24/12/1927. | ||
08/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1930. Dep: 05/04/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1139 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1932. Dep: 10/12/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1851 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/01/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
26/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1935. Dep: 09/02/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1210 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1936. Dep: 19/12/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 655 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1939. Dep: 28/01/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3244 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1941. Dep: 15/03/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1256 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1943. Dep: 14/08/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3229 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/09/1943. Dep: 25/09/1943. | ||
07/05/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
23/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1946. Dep: 09/03/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3377 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/03/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
26/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3686 | ||
03/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1948. Dep: 24/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1968 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63686 |
||
09/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
15/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
11/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1950. Dep: 25/02/1950. | ||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
16/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/06/1951. Dep: 28/07/1951. | ||
05/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1952. Dep: 26/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22261 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/08/1952. Dep: 30/08/1952. | ||
22/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/09/1954. Dep: 30/10/1954. | ||
04/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1957. Dep: 25/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22278 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 02/01/1960. Dep: 30/01/1960. | ||
15/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63686 from Gorton (9G) |