|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 01/03/1924 | 15/03/1924 | 15 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6324 |
||
Gorton Works | 18/10/1924 | 17/01/1925 | 92 days | General | Boiler number 1328 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/02/1928 | 14/04/1928 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 29/11/1930 | 27/12/1930 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1544 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/07/1933 | 29/07/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1111 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/11/1935 | 16/11/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3221 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/05/1938 | 14/05/1938 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3330 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/07/1940 | 27/07/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3406 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/05/1943 | 05/06/1943 | 12 days | General | Boiler number 1134 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/08/1943 | 28/08/1943 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 24/06/1944 | 22/07/1944 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1945 | 29/12/1945 | 78 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5032 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 1946 | 02/1946 | Light Repair | Drop Grate fitted |
|||
Gorton Works | 06/12/1947 | 27/12/1947 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 5052 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/06/1949 | 25/06/1949 | 1 day | Light Casual | Renumbered to BR 63687 |
||
Gorton Works | 18/03/1950 | 01/04/1950 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 5100 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/03/1952 | 12/04/1952 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 28805 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/08/1954 | 04/09/1954 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28371 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/08/1955 | 10/09/1955 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 02/06/1956 | 07/07/1956 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 23/08/1958 | 20/09/1958 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28314 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/04/1960 | 09/04/1960 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 22/04/1961 | 03/06/1961 | 43 days | Heavy Intermediate | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 13/01/1962 | 27/01/1962 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/07/1962 | 02/08/1962 | 4 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1669 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3713 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
01/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/03/1924. Dep: 15/03/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6324 |
||
15/03/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
22/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
26/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
18/10/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1924. Dep: 17/01/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1328 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/01/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
25/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1928. Dep: 14/04/1928. | ||
29/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1930. Dep: 27/12/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1544 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1933. Dep: 29/07/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1111 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1935. Dep: 16/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3221 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1938. Dep: 14/05/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3330 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1940. Dep: 27/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3406 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/09/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
21/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
25/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1943. Dep: 05/06/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1134 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/08/1943. Dep: 28/08/1943. | ||
12/12/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
24/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/06/1944. Dep: 22/07/1944. | ||
13/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1945. Dep: 29/12/1945. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5032 (Diagram 100A) |
||
1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1946. Dep: ?/02/1946. Work undertaken: Drop Grate fitted |
||
06/01/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
02/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3687 | ||
06/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1947. Dep: 27/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5052 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
21/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
07/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
13/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
25/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/06/1949. Dep: 25/06/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63687 |
||
18/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1950. Dep: 01/04/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5100 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
29/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1952. Dep: 12/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28805 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1954. Dep: 04/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28371 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/08/1955. Dep: 10/09/1955. | ||
02/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1956. Dep: 07/07/1956. | ||
10/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
23/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1958. Dep: 20/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28314 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/04/1960. Dep: 09/04/1960. | ||
22/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/04/1961. Dep: 03/06/1961. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
13/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/01/1962. Dep: 27/01/1962. | ||
30/07/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/07/1962. Dep: 02/08/1962. | ||
16/10/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63687 from March (31B) |