|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 17/01/1924 | 08/03/1924 | 52 days | Heavy | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6343 |
||
Gorton Works | 18/12/1926 | 30/03/1927 | 103 days | General | Boiler number 1465 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/02/1929 | 23/07/1929 | 149 days | General | Boiler number 1353 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/08/1931 | 09/10/1931 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 1146 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/05/1934 | 13/06/1934 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 1262 (Diagram 15) Wakefield 2C Lubricator added to axles |
||
Gorton Works | 21/06/1936 | 11/07/1936 | 21 days | General | Boiler number 1153 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/07/1938 | 20/08/1938 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 863 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/10/1940 | 02/11/1940 | 16 days | General | Boiler number 1231 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/05/1943 | 12/06/1943 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 1131 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/12/1944 | 13/01/1945 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 1021 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/10/1945 | 01/12/1945 | 62 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 13/12/1947 | 03/02/1948 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 3413 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3688 |
||
Gorton Works | 09/12/1948 | 08/01/1949 | 31 days | Light Casual | Renumbered to BR 63688 |
||
Gorton Works | 11/01/1949 | 22/01/1949 | 12 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 3350 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/11/1949 | 17/12/1949 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 814 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/02/1952 | 22/03/1952 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 22251 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/03/1954 | 10/04/1954 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 22235 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/09/1956 | 02/11/1956 | 57 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28923 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/03/1959 | 24/03/1959 | 23 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 26/01/1962 | 06/03/1962 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 28358 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/03/1963 | 26/03/1963 | 13 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/09/1947 | WD | The Italian State Railways have commenced renumbering the W.D. and U.S.A. locomotives they took over in 1946. Three classes have so far had new numbers allocated to them. The W.D. 2-8-2 Nos. 71016/28/37/8/40/83/4/5/7/9/95/7/8/1100/6/9/10/3/4/9/20/46/8/51/7/66/7/89/91/3, are to become 747.001 to 747.030. No. 71027 taken over in 1946 has apparently been withdrawn. The USA. 2-8-0 Nos. 1650/75/93/6, 1711/6/8/32/4/7/40/1/7/52/3/61/5/7/74/5/82, 1783/5/99, 1851/2/7/8/60/5/6/8/70, 2059/60/6/7/8/9/70/8/9/80/1, 2736-50, 2766-75, 3275-8, 3283-3320, 3322-6, 3328/9/32/4/5/6/7/9/42/8/50, 3380-96, 3405-8, 3411-28, 3430, 3562/8/9/70/1/2, 3611/7/8/9/22/3/40/1, 3660-71, 3685-99, 4418/21/37, 5701/2/31/5/6, 5740-58, 5760/1, 5825/9/34, 5835/44/5, are to become 736.001 to 736.243. Of these up to No. 2081 saw previous service in Algeria and Tunisia. The rest were shipped direct from the U.S.A. to Naples. No. 4418 was noted as Alco. 73410 of 1945. U.S.A. 0-6-OT Nos. 1927/9/30/1 are to become 831.001 to 831.004. No. 1928 has been withdrawn or sold. No mention has yet been made of the renumbering of the Stanier 2-8-0, but it seems more than likely that they will become Nos. 737.001 to 737.015. | SLS/194711 |
10/10/1965 | Doncaster Shed (Stored) | Stationary boiler: 92190. Stored: 61107/96, 61208, 61367, 63593, 63688, 63738, 90085/96/195/235/52/93/349/64/5/454/76/557/687. | SLS/196511 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1670 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3714 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
12/1919 | Allocation | |||
12/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2913 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
17/01/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 17/01/1924. Dep: 08/03/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6343 |
||
08/03/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
17/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
24/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
18/12/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1926. Dep: 30/03/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1465 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1929. Dep: 23/07/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1353 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1931. Dep: 09/10/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1146 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1934. Dep: 13/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1262 (Diagram 15) Wakefield 2C Lubricator added to axles |
||
21/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1936. Dep: 11/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1153 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1938. Dep: 20/08/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 863 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1940. Dep: 02/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1231 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1943. Dep: 12/06/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1131 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/12/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
10/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1944. Dep: 13/01/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1021 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1945. Dep: 01/12/1945. | ||
15/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3688 | ||
13/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1947. Dep: 03/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3413 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3688 |
||
09/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/12/1948. Dep: 08/01/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63688 |
||
11/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 11/01/1949. Dep: 22/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3350 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1949. Dep: 17/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 814 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1952. Dep: 22/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22251 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1954. Dep: 10/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22235 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1956. Dep: 02/11/1956. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28923 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/03/1959. Dep: 24/03/1959. | ||
26/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1962. Dep: 06/03/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28358 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/03/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/03/1963. Dep: 26/03/1963. | ||
13/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
26/09/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63688 from Doncaster (36A) |