|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 19/02/1927 | 07/05/1927 | 78 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6555 |
||
Gorton Works | 13/07/1929 | 10/08/1929 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 06/06/1931 | 27/06/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1468 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/11/1933 | 25/11/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1366 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/11/1935 | 07/12/1935 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3222 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/01/1938 | 05/02/1938 | 8 days | General | Chimney altered Boiler number 3216 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/05/1940 | 11/05/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3329 (Diagram 15) |
||
Stratford Works | 23/09/1942 | 31/10/1942 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 1019 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/04/1945 | 30/06/1945 | 71 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 28307 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/04/1947 | 31/05/1947 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 5014 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/02/1948 | 14/02/1948 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 12/06/1948 | 12/06/1948 | 1 day | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63630 |
||
Gorton Works | 02/04/1949 | 02/04/1949 | 1 day | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 30/07/1949 | 27/08/1949 | 29 days | General | Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 17/02/1951 | 10/03/1951 | 22 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 05/04/1952 | 19/04/1952 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 28828 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/04/1953 | 18/04/1953 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 27/03/1954 | 17/04/1954 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28341 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/03/1955 | 23/04/1955 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 13/08/1955 | 01/10/1955 | 50 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 04/08/1956 | 08/09/1956 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28339 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/01/1958 | 18/01/1958 | 1 day | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 20/09/1958 | 18/10/1958 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28975 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/02/1959 | 07/03/1959 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/01/1962 | 10/03/1962 | 54 days | General |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D5643, D8213, E3072-6. Stripping Road: D4055/63, 60129, 60853, 61285, 61315, 63630, 73036. Crimpsall: 60119, 63962. Outside Crimpsall: 60870, 60938, 61168, 62021/34. Scrap Road: 68900 intact, 61862, 61908 being cut up. Erecting Shop: D3482, D5525/95, D5642/57, 12126/33, 13288, 60043/61/78/83/97, 60107, 60817, 61252, 61374/5, 61899, 63571, 70003/7, 76021. Erecting Shop Yard: 60062, 60112. Boiler Park: 60014/47. Weigh House: D5547. Outside Weigh House: D3289, 61223, 63924, 68928, 70006. Paint Shop: D3336, D3487, D5371/2, D5822, E3070/1, 60087, 76046. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196203 |
26/02/1962 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1712 Built at Nasmyth Wilson, Works Number 1255 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
19/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1927. Dep: 07/05/1927. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6555 |
||
10/05/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
10/05/1927 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
13/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1929. Dep: 10/08/1929. | ||
06/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1931. Dep: 27/06/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1468 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1933. Dep: 25/11/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1366 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1935. Dep: 07/12/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3222 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1938. Dep: 05/02/1938. Work undertaken: Chimney altered Boiler number 3216 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1940. Dep: 11/05/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3329 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1942. Dep: 31/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1019 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
21/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1945. Dep: 30/06/1945. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 28307 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
09/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3630 | ||
19/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1947. Dep: 31/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5014 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/02/1948. Dep: 14/02/1948. | ||
12/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/06/1948. Dep: 12/06/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63630 |
||
02/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/04/1949. Dep: 02/04/1949. | ||
30/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1949. Dep: 27/08/1949. Work undertaken: Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted |
||
26/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
17/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 17/02/1951. Dep: 10/03/1951. | ||
05/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1952. Dep: 19/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28828 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/04/1953. Dep: 18/04/1953. | ||
27/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1954. Dep: 17/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28341 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/03/1955. Dep: 23/04/1955. | ||
13/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/08/1955. Dep: 01/10/1955. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
04/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1956. Dep: 08/09/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28339 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/03/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
18/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/01/1958. Dep: 18/01/1958. | ||
20/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1958. Dep: 18/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28975 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/02/1959. Dep: 07/03/1959. | ||
24/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) | ||
16/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1962. Dep: 10/03/1962. | ||
13/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
11/07/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63630 from Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
25/10/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |