Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 308 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 5919 Week
» 16965 Month
» 16965 Year
» 1682341 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1717 m/e 07/1918
London and North Western Railway 2975 m/e 06/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6536   24/10/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3633   17/11/1946
British Railways 63633 w/e 19/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/307/1918
O4/8 (2-8-0)26/04/1947
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Nasmyth Wilson
Order Number L926
Works Number 1260
To Service During 07/1918
Taken into Stock 24/10/1925
Withdrawal Wed 08/08/1962 off Ardsley (56B)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 44 yrs, 1 mth , 9 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 10/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1918
91LNWR (on loan)   06/1920
GOR Gorton on 20/10/1925
WFD Woodford Halse on 05/11/1925
STV Staveley (G.C.) on 07/05/1944
ANN Annesley on 12/10/1947
39A Gorton on 02/04/1950
37A Ardsley on 22/09/1952
   Withdrawn on 08/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley on 12/10/1947
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 08/04/1950
ALLOC 37A Ardsley 4w/e 04/10/1952
WDN   on 08/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1037)
03/03/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1139)
01/02/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1330)
31/12/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1087)
11/11/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1017)
08/02/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
08/02/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1490)
06/11/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3213)
16/03/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3389)
07/01/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1874)
28/10/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3382)
26/04/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5096)
19/02/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5098)
18/08/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28338)
12/05/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28852)
03/08/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28368)
19/08/1961 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28385)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 11/07/1925 24/10/1925 106 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6536
 
Gorton Works 28/01/1928 03/03/1928 36 days General
Boiler number 1139 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/01/1930 01/02/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1330 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/12/1931 31/12/1931 13 days General
Boiler number 1087 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/10/1933 11/11/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1017 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/01/1936 08/02/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 1490 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 23/10/1937 06/11/1937 15 days Heavy
Boiler number 3213 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/02/1940 16/03/1940 22 days General
Boiler number 3389 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 26/11/1942 07/01/1943 43 days General
Boiler number 1874 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/10/1944 28/10/1944 15 days General
Boiler number 22148 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/12/1945 12/01/1946 25 days Light Repair
Tender only
 
Gorton Works 01/03/1947 26/04/1947 57 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 5096 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 29/01/1949 19/02/1949 22 days General
Boiler number 5098 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63633
 
Gorton Works 28/07/1951 18/08/1951 22 days General
Boiler number 28338 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 30/08/1951 01/09/1951 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 17/04/1954 12/05/1954 26 days General  
Gorton Works 11/05/1954 19/05/1954 9 days Unclassified
Boiler number 28852 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 31/05/1954 02/06/1954 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 22/06/1957 03/08/1957 43 days General
Boiler number 28368 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 17/06/1961 19/08/1961 64 days General
Boiler number 28385 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1717
Built at Nasmyth Wilson, Works Number 1260
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
06/1920 Allocation      
06/1920 Renumbered Renumbered to 2975    
20/10/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
24/10/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
05/11/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
07/05/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
17/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3633    
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
02/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
22/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
08/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63633 from Ardsley (56B)    

prev prev