|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 11/07/1925 | 24/10/1925 | 106 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6536 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/01/1928 | 03/03/1928 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1139 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/01/1930 | 01/02/1930 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1330 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/12/1931 | 31/12/1931 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 1087 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/10/1933 | 11/11/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1017 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/01/1936 | 08/02/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1490 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/10/1937 | 06/11/1937 | 15 days | Heavy | Boiler number 3213 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/02/1940 | 16/03/1940 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3389 (Diagram 15) |
||
Stratford Works | 26/11/1942 | 07/01/1943 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1874 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/10/1944 | 28/10/1944 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22148 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/12/1945 | 12/01/1946 | 25 days | Light Repair | Tender only |
||
Gorton Works | 01/03/1947 | 26/04/1947 | 57 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 5096 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/01/1949 | 19/02/1949 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 5098 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63633 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/07/1951 | 18/08/1951 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28338 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/08/1951 | 01/09/1951 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 17/04/1954 | 12/05/1954 | 26 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 11/05/1954 | 19/05/1954 | 9 days | Unclassified | Boiler number 28852 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/05/1954 | 02/06/1954 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 22/06/1957 | 03/08/1957 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 28368 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/06/1961 | 19/08/1961 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 28385 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1717 Built at Nasmyth Wilson, Works Number 1260 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
06/1920 | Allocation | |||
06/1920 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2975 | ||
11/07/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1925. Dep: 24/10/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6536 |
||
20/10/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
24/10/1925 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
05/11/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
28/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1928. Dep: 03/03/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1139 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1930. Dep: 01/02/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1330 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/12/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1931. Dep: 31/12/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1087 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1933. Dep: 11/11/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1017 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1936. Dep: 08/02/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1490 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
23/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 23/10/1937. Dep: 06/11/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3213 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1940. Dep: 16/03/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3389 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1942. Dep: 07/01/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1874 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/05/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) | ||
14/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1944. Dep: 28/10/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22148 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/12/1945. Dep: 12/01/1946. Work undertaken: Tender only |
||
17/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3633 | ||
01/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1947. Dep: 26/04/1947. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 5096 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
29/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1949. Dep: 19/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5098 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63633 |
||
02/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
08/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
28/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1951. Dep: 18/08/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28338 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/08/1951. Dep: 01/09/1951. | ||
22/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
17/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1954. Dep: 12/05/1954. | ||
11/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/05/1954. Dep: 19/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28852 (Diagram 100A) |
||
31/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/05/1954. Dep: 02/06/1954. | ||
22/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1957. Dep: 03/08/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28368 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1961. Dep: 19/08/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28385 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/08/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63633 from Ardsley (56B) |