Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 991 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 2163 Week
» 21064 Month
» 21064 Year
» 1686440 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1718 m/e 08/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6377   01/03/1924
War Dept. 762   19/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Nasmyth Wilson
Order Number L926
Works Number 1261
To Service During 08/1918
Taken into Stock 01/03/1924
Withdrawal Fri 19/09/1941 off Grantham (GRA)
Service Life 23 yrs, 1 mth , 19 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 762 and sent to the Middle East

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1918
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 05/03/1924
DON Doncaster on 16/01/1925
NWE New England on 15/01/1926
CLK Colwick on 24/10/1935
GRA Grantham on 16/09/1940
   Withdrawn on 19/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1269)
30/08/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1191)
18/01/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1164)
25/06/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1124)
01/09/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1757)
16/01/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1107)
08/07/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3293)
25/10/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1121)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 16/02/1924 01/03/1924 15 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6377
 
Gorton Works 31/05/1924 30/08/1924 92 days General
Boiler number 1191 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/07/1927 20/08/1927 36 days General  
Gorton Works 28/12/1929 18/01/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1164 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/06/1932 25/06/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1124 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/08/1934 01/09/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 1757 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1936 16/01/1937 17 days General
Boiler number 1107 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/06/1939 08/07/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 3293 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/10/1941 25/10/1941 23 days General
Boiler number 1121 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1718
Built at Nasmyth Wilson, Works Number 1261
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
01/03/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
05/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
16/01/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
15/01/1926 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
24/10/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
16/09/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
19/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 762 from Grantham (GRA)    
19/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 762    

prev prev