Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 96 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 96 Week
» 26717 Month
» 26717 Year
» 1692093 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1722 m/e 10/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6558   28/04/1928
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3637   16/11/1946
British Railways 63637 w/e 30/07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Nasmyth Wilson
Order Number L926
Works Number 1265
To Service During 10/1918
Taken into Stock 03/05/1928
Withdrawal Sun 09/12/1962 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 44 yrs, 2 mths , 9 dys

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 16/9/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1918
DON Doncaster on 03/05/1928
IMM Immingham on 19/09/1933
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 11/01/1939
   Withdrawn on 09/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 09/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1315)
12/03/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 853)
05/10/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3212)
30/04/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1237)
23/11/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3298)
06/03/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1130)
28/04/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3381)
05/07/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3223)
30/07/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3224)
29/12/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22234)
12/01/1957 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22202)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 10/03/1928 28/04/1928 50 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6558
 
Gorton Works 22/03/1930 03/05/1930 43 days General  
Gorton Works 05/03/1932 12/03/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 853 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/09/1935 05/10/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 3212 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/04/1938 30/04/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 1237 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/11/1940 23/11/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 3298 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/02/1943 06/03/1943 23 days General
Boiler number 1130 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/04/1945 28/04/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 3381 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/06/1947 05/07/1947 29 days General
Boiler number 3223 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/06/1949 30/07/1949 36 days General
Boiler number 3224 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63637
 
Gorton Works 08/12/1951 29/12/1951 22 days General
Boiler number 22234 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1951 04/01/1952 5 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 22/05/1954 12/06/1954 22 days Light Intermediate  
Gorton Works 15/06/1954 18/06/1954 4 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 15/12/1956 12/01/1957 29 days General
Boiler number 22202 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/01/1957 25/01/1957 6 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 02/04/1960 21/05/1960 50 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 11/06/1960 18/06/1960 8 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1722
Built at Nasmyth Wilson, Works Number 1265
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
03/05/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
03/05/1928 To Stock To LNER stock    
19/09/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
11/01/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
16/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3637    
09/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63637 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev