Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 300 Today
» 1097 Yesterday
» 2569 Week
» 21470 Month
» 21470 Year
» 1686846 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1723 m/e 10/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6375   05/04/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3638   07/12/1946
British Railways 63638 w/e 02/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Nasmyth Wilson
Order Number L926
Works Number 1266
To Service During 10/1918
Taken into Stock 05/04/1924
Withdrawal Thu 12/03/1959 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 40 yrs, 5 mths , 10 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1918
GOR Gorton on 05/04/1924
CLK Colwick on 17/01/1945
ANN Annesley on 12/10/1947
CLK Colwick on 08/02/1948
ANN Annesley on 14/11/1948
CLK Colwick on 18/12/1949
39A Gorton on 02/04/1950
38A Colwick on 13/06/1954
   Withdrawn on 12/03/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley on 12/10/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 14/02/1948
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 20/11/1948
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 24/12/1949
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 08/04/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 19/06/1954
WDN   on 12/03/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1362)
20/09/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1152)
21/09/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1227)
01/08/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1120)
16/09/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1237)
04/05/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 805)
26/09/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3261)
17/01/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1266)
17/06/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1245)
07/12/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1232)
02/10/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3229)
10/03/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22167)
21/02/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22116)
20/08/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22102)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 22/03/1924 05/04/1924 15 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6375
 
Gorton Works 28/06/1924 20/09/1924 85 days General
Boiler number 1152 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/07/1927 13/08/1927 36 days General  
Gorton Works 10/08/1929 21/09/1929 43 days General
Boiler number 1227 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/07/1931 01/08/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 1120 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/08/1933 16/09/1933 22 days General
Boiler number 1237 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/04/1935 04/05/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 805 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/09/1936 26/09/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 3261 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/01/1939 11/02/1939 15 days General  
Gorton Works 01/01/1942 17/01/1942 17 days General
Boiler number 1266 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/06/1944 17/06/1944 15 days General
Boiler number 1245 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/01/1946 06/02/1946 12 days Unclassified
Tender change
 
Gorton Works 16/11/1946 07/12/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 1232 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3638
 
Gorton Works 18/09/1948 02/10/1948 15 days General
Boiler number 3229 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63638
 
Gorton Works 14/04/1949 28/05/1949 45 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 17/02/1951 10/03/1951 22 days General
Boiler number 22167 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/01/1953 21/02/1953 22 days General
Boiler number 22116 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/07/1955 20/08/1955 22 days General
Boiler number 22102 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/06/1957 29/06/1957 29 days Heavy Casual
After collision
 
Gorton Works 03/07/1957 14/07/1957 12 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 22/02/1958 05/04/1958 43 days Heavy Casual  
Gorton Works 05/03/1959 05/03/1959 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1723
Built at Nasmyth Wilson, Works Number 1266
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
05/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
05/04/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
17/01/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
08/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
14/11/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
18/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
02/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
12/03/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63638 from Colwick (40E)    

prev prev