|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 22/03/1924 | 05/04/1924 | 15 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6375 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/06/1924 | 20/09/1924 | 85 days | General | Boiler number 1152 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/07/1927 | 13/08/1927 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 10/08/1929 | 21/09/1929 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1227 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/07/1931 | 01/08/1931 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1120 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/08/1933 | 16/09/1933 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1237 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/04/1935 | 04/05/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 805 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/09/1936 | 26/09/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3261 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/01/1939 | 11/02/1939 | 15 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 01/01/1942 | 17/01/1942 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 1266 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/06/1944 | 17/06/1944 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1245 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/01/1946 | 06/02/1946 | 12 days | Unclassified | Tender change |
||
Gorton Works | 16/11/1946 | 07/12/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1232 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3638 |
||
Gorton Works | 18/09/1948 | 02/10/1948 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3229 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63638 |
||
Gorton Works | 14/04/1949 | 28/05/1949 | 45 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 17/02/1951 | 10/03/1951 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22167 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/01/1953 | 21/02/1953 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22116 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/07/1955 | 20/08/1955 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22102 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/06/1957 | 29/06/1957 | 29 days | Heavy Casual | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 03/07/1957 | 14/07/1957 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 22/02/1958 | 05/04/1958 | 43 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 05/03/1959 | 05/03/1959 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1723 Built at Nasmyth Wilson, Works Number 1266 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
22/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/03/1924. Dep: 05/04/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6375 |
||
05/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
05/04/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
28/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1924. Dep: 20/09/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1152 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1927. Dep: 13/08/1927. | ||
10/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1929. Dep: 21/09/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1227 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/07/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1931. Dep: 01/08/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1120 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1933. Dep: 16/09/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1237 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1935. Dep: 04/05/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 805 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1936. Dep: 26/09/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3261 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1939. Dep: 11/02/1939. | ||
01/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1942. Dep: 17/01/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1266 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1944. Dep: 17/06/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1245 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
26/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/01/1946. Dep: 06/02/1946. Work undertaken: Tender change |
||
16/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1946. Dep: 07/12/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1232 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3638 |
||
12/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
08/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
14/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
18/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1948. Dep: 02/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3229 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63638 |
||
14/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
20/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
14/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/04/1949. Dep: 28/05/1949. | ||
18/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
24/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
02/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
08/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
17/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1951. Dep: 10/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22167 (Diagram 15) |
||
31/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1953. Dep: 21/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22116 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
30/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1955. Dep: 20/08/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22102 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 01/06/1957. Dep: 29/06/1957. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
03/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/07/1957. Dep: 14/07/1957. | ||
22/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 22/02/1958. Dep: 05/04/1958. | ||
05/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 05/03/1959. Dep: 05/03/1959. | ||
12/03/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63638 from Colwick (40E) |