|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 02/03/1929 | 18/04/1929 | 48 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6559 |
||
Gorton Works | 23/12/1930 | 03/03/1931 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 1967 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/09/1933 | 21/10/1933 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 1478 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/10/1934 | 01/12/1934 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 933 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/07/1937 | 13/08/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3302 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/06/1940 | 29/06/1940 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 1940 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/04/1943 | 15/05/1943 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 1968 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/06/1945 | 01/09/1945 | 73 days | General | Boiler number 3410 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/10/1947 | 27/11/1947 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3216 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/07/1949 | 20/08/1949 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 3296 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63639 |
||
Gorton Works | 22/11/1950 | 08/12/1950 | 17 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 22143 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/12/1950 | 29/12/1950 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 05/04/1952 | 03/05/1952 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22266 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/05/1952 | 07/05/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 14/05/1952 | 24/05/1952 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 12/10/1954 | 11/12/1954 | 61 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28313 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/09/1957 | 12/10/1957 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 28936 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/03/1960 | 20/04/1960 | 35 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 28825 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/07/1962 | 29/08/1962 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 03/09/1962 | 07/09/1962 | 5 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1724 Built at Nasmyth Wilson, Works Number 1267 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
02/03/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1929. Dep: 18/04/1929. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6559 |
||
18/04/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
18/04/1929 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
01/05/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
23/12/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1930. Dep: 03/03/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1967 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1933. Dep: 21/10/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1478 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1934. Dep: 01/12/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 933 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1937. Dep: 13/08/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3302 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1940. Dep: 29/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1940 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1943. Dep: 15/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1968 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
21/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1945. Dep: 01/09/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3410 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3639 | ||
23/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1947. Dep: 27/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3216 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
30/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
18/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1949. Dep: 20/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3296 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63639 |
||
22/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 22/11/1950. Dep: 08/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22143 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/12/1950. Dep: 29/12/1950. | ||
05/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1952. Dep: 03/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22266 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/05/1952. Dep: 07/05/1952. | ||
14/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/05/1952. Dep: 24/05/1952. | ||
28/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
12/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1954. Dep: 11/12/1954. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28313 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/01/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
17/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
05/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1957. Dep: 12/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28936 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 17/03/1960. Dep: 20/04/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28825 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/07/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/07/1962. Dep: 29/08/1962. | ||
03/09/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/09/1962. Dep: 07/09/1962. | ||
19/12/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63639 from Colwick (40E) |