Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 76 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 76 Week
» 11221 Month
» 111006 Year
» 1776382 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1605 m/e 02/1918
London and North Western Railway 2870 m/e 09/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6374   10/05/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3646   01/12/1946
British Railways (BR Tmp) E3646   14/02/1948
British Railways 63646 w/e 07/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/302/1918
O1 (2-8-0)15/09/1945
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 477Z
Works Number 5187
To Service During 02/1918
Taken into Stock 10/05/1924
Withdrawal Sun 11/07/1965 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Service Life 47 yrs, 5 mths , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Mon 04/10/1965 at Drapers (Hull)

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to A Draper, Hull, 8/65. Cut up 4/10/65

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1918
91LNWR   (on loan)   09/1919
ROD       08/1921
GOR   Gorton on 08/05/1924
SHF   Sheffield Neepsend on 17/05/1924
DON   Doncaster on 16/01/1925
IMM   Immingham on 30/05/1929
LNG   Langwith Junction on 16/10/1941
GOR   Gorton on 23/09/1945
WFD   Woodford Halse on 18/08/1946
GOR   Gorton on 20/10/1946
38B   Annesley on 02/07/1950
31B   March on 24/02/1957
41H   Staveley (G.C.) on 31/01/1960
41J   Langwith Junction on 13/06/1965
     Withdrawn on 11/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 20/02/1960
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   w/e 11/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1179)
01/06/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1869)
26/09/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1035)
20/01/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1145)
15/08/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
15/08/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1462)
15/10/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1270)
18/01/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1153)
28/08/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3281)
15/09/1945 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5043)
02/1946 Drop Grate fitted
16/08/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5035)
11/03/1950 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5113)
19/04/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28377)
06/03/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28297)
05/05/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28379)
30/08/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28851)
10/07/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28265)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 15/03/1924 10/05/1924 57 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6374
 
Gorton Works 18/12/1926 26/02/1927 71 days General    
Gorton Works 23/02/1929 01/06/1929 99 days General Boiler number 1869 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/09/1931 26/09/1931 22 days General Boiler number 1035 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/01/1934 20/01/1934 8 days General Boiler number 1145 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/08/1936 15/08/1936 15 days General Boiler number 1462 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 01/10/1938 15/10/1938 15 days General Boiler number 1270 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/01/1941 18/01/1941 8 days General Boiler number 1153 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/08/1943 28/08/1943 12 days Heavy Speed indicator fitted
Boiler number 3281 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/06/1945 15/09/1945 78 days General Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5043 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 1946 02/1946   Light Repair Drop Grate fitted
 
Gorton Works 27/04/1946 04/05/1946 8 days Light Repair After collision
 
Gorton Works 15/06/1946 22/06/1946 8 days Light Repair After collision
 
Gorton Works 26/07/1947 16/08/1947 22 days General Boiler number 5035 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 09/02/1948 14/02/1948 6 days Light Repair Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3646
 
Gorton Works 07/05/1949 07/05/1949 1 day Light Casual Renumbered to BR 63646
 
Gorton Works 25/02/1950 11/03/1950 15 days General Boiler number 5113 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 29/03/1952 19/04/1952 22 days General Boiler number 28377 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 18/04/1953 09/05/1953 22 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 13/02/1954 06/03/1954 22 days General Boiler number 28297 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 12/02/1955 12/03/1955 29 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 07/04/1956 05/05/1956 29 days General Boiler number 28379 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 12/07/1958 30/08/1958 50 days General Boiler number 28851 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 04/05/1962 10/07/1962 68 days General Boiler number 28265 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 18/07/1962 03/08/1962 17 days Light Casual    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1605
Built at Kitson, Works Number 5187
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2870    
08/1921 Allocation      
15/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1924. Dep: 10/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6374
   
08/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
10/05/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
17/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
16/01/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
18/12/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1926. Dep: 26/02/1927.    
23/02/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1929. Dep: 01/06/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1869 (Diagram 15)
   
30/05/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
05/09/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1931. Dep: 26/09/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1035 (Diagram 15)
   
13/01/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1934. Dep: 20/01/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1145 (Diagram 15)
   
01/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1936. Dep: 15/08/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1462 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
01/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1938. Dep: 15/10/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1270 (Diagram 15)
   
11/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1941. Dep: 18/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1153 (Diagram 15)
   
16/10/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
17/08/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 17/08/1943. Dep: 28/08/1943.
Work undertaken:
Speed indicator fitted
Boiler number 3281 (Diagram 15)
   
30/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1945. Dep: 15/09/1945.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5043 (Diagram 100A)
   
23/09/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1946. Dep: ?/02/1946.
Work undertaken:
Drop Grate fitted
   
27/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/04/1946. Dep: 04/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
15/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/06/1946. Dep: 22/06/1946.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
01/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3646    
26/07/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1947. Dep: 16/08/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5035 (Diagram 100A)
   
09/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/02/1948. Dep: 14/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3646
   
07/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/05/1949. Dep: 07/05/1949.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63646
   
25/02/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1950. Dep: 11/03/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5113 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
29/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1952. Dep: 19/04/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28377 (Diagram 100A)
   
18/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/04/1953. Dep: 09/05/1953.    
13/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1954. Dep: 06/03/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28297 (Diagram 100A)
   
12/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/02/1955. Dep: 12/03/1955.    
07/04/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1956. Dep: 05/05/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28379 (Diagram 100A)
   
24/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
12/07/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1958. Dep: 30/08/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28851 (Diagram 100A)
   
31/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
04/05/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1962. Dep: 10/07/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28265 (Diagram 100A)
   
18/07/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/07/1962. Dep: 03/08/1962.    
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
11/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63646 from Langwith Junction (41J)    
04/10/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev