|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 26/01/1929 | 04/05/1929 | 99 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6545 |
||
Gorton Works | 01/08/1931 | 22/08/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1227 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/11/1933 | 02/12/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1046 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/04/1936 | 02/05/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1318 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/06/1938 | 09/07/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1881 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/12/1940 | 04/01/1941 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1002 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/05/1942 | 06/06/1942 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 03/02/1943 | 20/02/1943 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 3244 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/03/1945 | 26/05/1945 | 85 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5035 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/06/1947 | 28/06/1947 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 5031 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/08/1949 | 03/09/1949 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 5011 (Diagram 100A) Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted Renumbered to BR 63650 |
||
Gorton Works | 02/02/1952 | 23/02/1952 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28372 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/09/1953 | 17/10/1953 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28325 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/06/1954 | 03/07/1954 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 01/10/1955 | 29/10/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28809 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/12/1957 | 01/02/1958 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28824 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/12/1958 | 13/12/1958 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 04/02/1961 | 11/03/1961 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28299 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/02/1963 | 19/03/1963 | 28 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 28983 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/03/1963 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: 60025/44/512, 61157, 63650/978, 90001/79/411/587. Works Yard: 90035/250. Stripping Shop: 61326, 90551. Scrap Yard: 42501/18/25/6/679, 63887, 64690, 90253/70, 69520/3/38/46/75/83. Paint Shop: 65567, LNER 4472, LNER 4771. Ex Works: 61087, Waiting Works: 60118, 61128/236/87/371, 63618/98/961, 42535, 69529/68, 90559/608. Pending sale: 60014. | SLS/196304 |
11/05/1963 | Worcester Works (Erecting Shop) | 4628, 7010/23/31, 9724 an 4147. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1609 Built at Kitson, Works Number 5191 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
26/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1929. Dep: 04/05/1929. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6545 |
||
03/05/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
03/05/1929 | To Stock | To ROD stock | ||
01/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1931. Dep: 22/08/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1227 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1933. Dep: 02/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1046 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1936. Dep: 02/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1318 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
25/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1938. Dep: 09/07/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1881 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1940. Dep: 04/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1002 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/05/1942. Dep: 06/06/1942. | ||
03/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1943. Dep: 20/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3244 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
03/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1945. Dep: 26/05/1945. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5035 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
02/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3650 | ||
07/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1947. Dep: 28/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5031 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1949. Dep: 03/09/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5011 (Diagram 100A) Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted Renumbered to BR 63650 |
||
26/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
02/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1952. Dep: 23/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28372 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1953. Dep: 17/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28325 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/06/1954. Dep: 03/07/1954. | ||
01/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1955. Dep: 29/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28809 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
28/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1957. Dep: 01/02/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28824 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/12/1958. Dep: 13/12/1958. | ||
07/02/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) | ||
04/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1961. Dep: 11/03/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28299 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/02/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 20/02/1963. Dep: 19/03/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28983 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
27/06/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63650 from Langwith Junction (41J) |