Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 40 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 4759 Week
» 15904 Month
» 115689 Year
» 1781065 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1612 m/e 04/1918
London and North Western Railway 2902 m/e 12/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6370   20/08/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3653   13/10/1946
British Railways 63653 w/e 25/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/204/1918
O4/8 (2-8-0)09/02/1947
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 477Z
Works Number 5194
To Service During 04/1918
Taken into Stock 20/08/1924
Withdrawal Sun 17/04/1966 off Doncaster (36A)
Service Life 48 yrs , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping W George, Station Steel (Wath)

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Station Steel, Wath, 5/66

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1918
91LNWR   (on loan)   12/1919
ROD       08/1921
29B   Aberdeen Ferryhill on 20/08/1924
CAR   Carlisle Canal on 27/10/1939
ABD   Aberdeen Ferryhill on 02/11/1939
IMM   Immingham on 16/07/1943
MAR   March on 07/09/1944
36C   Frodingham on 26/03/1950
36C   Frodingham w/e 01/04/1950
36A   Doncaster on 19/09/1965
     Withdrawn on 17/04/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36C Frodingham w/e 01/04/1950
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 5w/e 09/10/1965
WDN   on 17/04/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number C1475)
05/11/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1104)
30/01/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1245)
22/07/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3274)
29/11/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3306)
18/03/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3261)
09/02/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5011)
25/06/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5097)
01/03/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28827)
09/07/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28830)
02/03/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28842)
22/06/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28390)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Darlington Works 22/02/1924 20/08/1924 181 days General Rebuilt to class O4/2
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6370
 
Cowlairs Works 03/11/1926 19/02/1927 109 days General    
Cowlairs Works 10/01/1929 02/03/1929 52 days General    
Cowlairs Works 19/11/1930 18/12/1930 30 days General    
Cowlairs Works 02/03/1932 06/04/1932 36 days General    
Gorton Works 28/09/1934 05/11/1934 39 days General Boiler number 1104 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/12/1936 30/01/1937 36 days General Boiler number 1245 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/07/1939 22/07/1939 20 days General Boiler number 3274 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/10/1941 29/11/1941 47 days General Boiler number 3306 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/02/1944 18/03/1944 25 days General Boiler number 3261 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/11/1946 09/02/1947 91 days General Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 5011 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 24/05/1949 25/06/1949 33 days General Boiler number 5097 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63653
 
Gorton Works 31/01/1952 01/03/1952 31 days General Boiler number 28827 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 07/03/1952 08/03/1952 2 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 14/06/1954 09/07/1954 26 days General Boiler number 28830 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 31/01/1957 02/03/1957 31 days General Boiler number 28842 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 02/10/1959 05/11/1959 35 days Light Intermediate    
Gorton Works 13/04/1961 06/05/1961 24 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 09/05/1962 22/06/1962 45 days General Boiler number 28390 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1612
Built at Kitson, Works Number 5194
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/1919 Allocation      
12/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2902    
08/1921 Allocation      
22/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1924. Dep: 20/08/1924.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/2
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6370
   
20/08/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (29B)    
20/08/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
03/11/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1926. Dep: 19/02/1927.    
10/01/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1929. Dep: 02/03/1929.    
19/11/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1930. Dep: 18/12/1930.    
02/03/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1932. Dep: 06/04/1932.    
28/09/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1934. Dep: 05/11/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1104 (Diagram 15)
   
26/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/12/1936. Dep: 30/01/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1245 (Diagram 15)
   
03/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1939. Dep: 22/07/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3274 (Diagram 15)
   
27/10/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR)    
02/11/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)    
14/10/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1941. Dep: 29/11/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3306 (Diagram 15)
   
16/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
23/02/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1944. Dep: 18/03/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3261 (Diagram 15)
   
07/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
13/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3653    
11/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1946. Dep: 09/02/1947.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 5011 (Diagram 100A)
   
24/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1949. Dep: 25/06/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5097 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63653
   
26/03/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
01/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
31/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1952. Dep: 01/03/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28827 (Diagram 100A)
   
07/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/03/1952. Dep: 08/03/1952.    
14/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1954. Dep: 09/07/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28830 (Diagram 100A)
   
31/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1957. Dep: 02/03/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28842 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/10/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 02/10/1959. Dep: 05/11/1959.    
13/04/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/04/1961. Dep: 06/05/1961.    
09/05/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1962. Dep: 22/06/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28390 (Diagram 100A)
   
19/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
17/04/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 63653 from Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev