|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 22/02/1924 | 20/08/1924 | 181 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/2 Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6370 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 03/11/1926 | 19/02/1927 | 109 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/01/1929 | 02/03/1929 | 52 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/11/1930 | 18/12/1930 | 30 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/03/1932 | 06/04/1932 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 28/09/1934 | 05/11/1934 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 1104 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/12/1936 | 30/01/1937 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1245 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/07/1939 | 22/07/1939 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 3274 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/10/1941 | 29/11/1941 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 3306 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/02/1944 | 18/03/1944 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 3261 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/11/1946 | 09/02/1947 | 91 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 5011 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/05/1949 | 25/06/1949 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 5097 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63653 |
||
Gorton Works | 31/01/1952 | 01/03/1952 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28827 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/03/1952 | 08/03/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 14/06/1954 | 09/07/1954 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28830 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/01/1957 | 02/03/1957 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28842 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/10/1959 | 05/11/1959 | 35 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 13/04/1961 | 06/05/1961 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 09/05/1962 | 22/06/1962 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 28390 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1612 Built at Kitson, Works Number 5194 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
12/1919 | Allocation | |||
12/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2902 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
22/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1924. Dep: 20/08/1924. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/2 Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6370 |
||
20/08/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stirling (29B) | ||
20/08/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
03/11/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1926. Dep: 19/02/1927. | ||
10/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1929. Dep: 02/03/1929. | ||
19/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1930. Dep: 18/12/1930. | ||
02/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1932. Dep: 06/04/1932. | ||
28/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1934. Dep: 05/11/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1104 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/12/1936. Dep: 30/01/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1245 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1939. Dep: 22/07/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3274 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/10/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) | ||
02/11/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) | ||
14/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1941. Dep: 29/11/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3306 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
23/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1944. Dep: 18/03/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3261 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
13/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3653 | ||
11/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1946. Dep: 09/02/1947. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 5011 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1949. Dep: 25/06/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5097 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63653 |
||
26/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
01/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
31/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1952. Dep: 01/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28827 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/03/1952. Dep: 08/03/1952. | ||
14/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1954. Dep: 09/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28830 (Diagram 100A) |
||
31/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1957. Dep: 02/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28842 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 02/10/1959. Dep: 05/11/1959. | ||
13/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/04/1961. Dep: 06/05/1961. | ||
09/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1962. Dep: 22/06/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28390 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/09/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
17/04/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63653 from Doncaster (36A) |