Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 523 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6134 Week
» 17180 Month
» 17180 Year
» 1682556 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1619 m/e 07/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6368   12/04/1924
War Dept. 715   13/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 479C
Works Number 5205
To Service During 07/1918
Taken into Stock 12/04/1924
Withdrawal Sat 13/09/1941 off Colwick (CLK)
Service Life 23 yrs, 2 mths , 14 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 715 and sent to the Middle East via Birkenhead, 16/9/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1918
GOR Gorton on 10/04/1924
ANN Annesley on 10/05/1924
CLK Colwick on 15/02/1934
   Withdrawn on 13/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1431)
16/10/1926 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1435)
13/06/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1358)
06/01/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 111)
06/01/1934 Empire twin plunger Lubricator fitted to axles
09/05/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1883)
17/09/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1941)
29/03/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1046)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 02/02/1924 12/04/1924 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6368
 
Gorton Works 31/07/1926 16/10/1926 78 days General
Boiler number 1435 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/12/1928 02/02/1929 43 days General  
Gorton Works 16/05/1931 13/06/1931 29 days General
Boiler number 1358 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/12/1933 06/01/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 111 (Diagram 15)
Empire twin plunger Lubricator fitted to axles
 
Gorton Works 25/04/1936 09/05/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1883 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/08/1938 17/09/1938 29 days General
Boiler number 1941 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/03/1941 29/03/1941 22 days General
Boiler number 1046 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1619
Built at Kitson, Works Number 5205
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
10/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
12/04/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
10/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
15/02/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
13/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 715 from Colwick (CLK)    
13/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 715    

prev prev