Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 346 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 5957 Week
» 17003 Month
» 17003 Year
» 1682379 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1621 m/e 07/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6547   08/10/1927
War Dept. 738   05/10/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 479C
Works Number 5207
To Service During 07/1918
Taken into Stock 07/10/1927
Withdrawal Sun 05/10/1941 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)
Service Life 23 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 738 and sent to the Middle East via Bidston, 14/10/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1918
DON Doncaster on 07/10/1927
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 07/04/1933
   Withdrawn on 05/10/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1212)
28/05/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1173)
22/06/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number C1467)
17/07/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 857)
05/08/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3286)
20/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3442)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 16/07/1927 08/10/1927 85 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6547
 
Gorton Works 25/02/1928 17/03/1928 22 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 15/02/1930 22/03/1930 36 days General  
Gorton Works 14/05/1932 28/05/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1173 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/06/1935 22/06/1935 15 days General
Boiler number C1467 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/07/1937 17/07/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 857 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/07/1939 05/08/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 3286 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/09/1941 20/09/1941 13 days General
Boiler number 3442 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1621
Built at Kitson, Works Number 5207
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
07/10/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
07/10/1927 To Stock To ROD stock    
07/04/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
05/10/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 738 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
05/10/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 738    

prev prev