|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 16/07/1927 | 08/10/1927 | 85 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6547 |
||
Gorton Works | 25/02/1928 | 17/03/1928 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 15/02/1930 | 22/03/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/05/1932 | 28/05/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1173 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/06/1935 | 22/06/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number C1467 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/07/1937 | 17/07/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 857 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/07/1939 | 05/08/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3286 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/09/1941 | 20/09/1941 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 3442 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1621 Built at Kitson, Works Number 5207 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
16/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1927. Dep: 08/10/1927. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6547 |
||
07/10/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
07/10/1927 | To Stock | To ROD stock | ||
25/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/02/1928. Dep: 17/03/1928. | ||
15/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1930. Dep: 22/03/1930. | ||
14/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1932. Dep: 28/05/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1173 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/04/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
08/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1935. Dep: 22/06/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1467 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1937. Dep: 17/07/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 857 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1939. Dep: 05/08/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3286 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1941. Dep: 20/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3442 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/10/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 738 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
05/10/1941 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 738 |