Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 287 Today
» 1097 Yesterday
» 2556 Week
» 21457 Month
» 21457 Year
» 1686833 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1622 m/e 07/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6540   01/08/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3661   10/01/1947
British Railways 63661 w/e 11/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/307/1918
O4/7 (2-8-0)03/08/1940
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 479C
Works Number 5208
To Service During 07/1918
Taken into Stock 01/08/1925
Withdrawal Sun 08/08/1965 off Frodingham (36C)
Scrapping T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 47 yrs, 1 mth , 9 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to T W Ward, Beighton, 9/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1918
GOR Gorton on 01/08/1925
CLK Colwick on 18/08/1925
91W To Western Region / GWR (on loan) on 23/11/1940
WFD Woodford Halse on 30/07/1942
SHF Sheffield Darnall on 03/02/1946
41H Staveley (G.C.) on 27/03/1960
41F Mexborough on 04/12/1960
41H Staveley (G.C.) on 11/02/1962
41F Mexborough on 09/09/1962
41A Sheffield Darnall on 09/12/1962
41F Mexborough on 20/01/1963
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 22/09/1963
36C Frodingham on 13/06/1965
   Withdrawn on 08/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall m/e 28/02/1946
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 16/04/1960
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 5w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 5w/e 10/03/1962
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 41A Sheffield Darnall 2w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 3w/e 02/02/1963
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 6w/e 05/10/1963
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   w/e 08/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1147)
11/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1745)
07/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1140)
09/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1745)
04/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3324)
03/08/1940 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3673)
07/04/1944 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3670)
28/09/1946 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3658)
11/12/1948 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 5101)
02/02/1952 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22328)
23/03/1957 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22318)
14/09/1961 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22312)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1925 01/08/1925   General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6540
 
Gorton Works 1928 21/04/1928   General  
Gorton Works 25/10/1930 11/1930   General
Boiler number 1745 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/07/1933 07/1933   General  
Gorton Works 12/09/1935 30/09/1935 19 days General  
Gorton Works 25/03/1938 04/1938   General
Boiler number 3324 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/07/1940 03/08/1940 16 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3673 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 27/08/1942 10/10/1942 45 days General  
Gorton Works 12/03/1944 07/04/1944 27 days General
Boiler number 3670 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 29/07/1946 28/09/1946 62 days General
Boiler number 22313 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 07/11/1948 11/12/1948 35 days General
Boiler number 5101 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63661
 
Gorton Works 06/01/1952 02/02/1952 28 days General
Boiler number 22328 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 05/02/1952 07/02/1952 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 18/05/1954 19/06/1954 33 days Heavy  
Gorton Works 16/02/1957 23/03/1957 36 days General
Boiler number 22318 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 24/07/1961 14/09/1961 53 days General
Boiler number 22312 (Diagram 15D)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1622
Built at Kitson, Works Number 5208
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
01/08/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
01/08/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
18/08/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
07/1933 Modification Diagram 15 number 1140 boiler fitted    
09/1935 Modification Diagram 15 number 1745 boiler fitted    
23/11/1940 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
30/07/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
03/02/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
10/01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3661    
27/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
04/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
11/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
09/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
09/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
20/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
22/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
08/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63661 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev