Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 75 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 75 Week
» 11220 Month
» 111005 Year
» 1776381 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1629 m/e 09/1918
London and North Western Railway 2956 m/e 06/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6367   09/02/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3667   01/09/1946
British Railways 63667 m/e 30/06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 479C
Works Number 5215
To Service During 09/1918
Taken into Stock 09/02/1924
Withdrawal Mon 19/01/1959 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Service Life 40 yrs, 4 mths , 19 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1918
91LNWR   (on loan)   06/1920
GOR   Gorton on 09/02/1924
IMM   Immingham on 01/01/1935
HTN   Heaton on 28/02/1940
TDK   Tyne Dock on 23/07/1945
HTN   Heaton on 22/07/1946
TDK   Tyne Dock on 08/09/1946
CUD   Cudworth on 07/11/1948
CUD   Cudworth w/e 13/11/1948
53A   Hull Dairycoates on 22/04/1951
53A   Hull Dairycoates w/e 28/04/1951
40E   Langwith Junction on 02/09/1951
40E   Langwith Junction w/e 08/09/1951
     Withdrawn on 19/01/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CUD Cudworth w/e 13/11/1948
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates w/e 28/04/1951
LOAN 40B Immingham on 02/09/1951
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction w/e 08/09/1951
WDN   on 19/01/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 784)
18/09/1926 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1757)
25/01/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1196)
09/04/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1692)
08/12/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1174)
17/07/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3303)
29/07/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 549)
20/12/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3243)
29/01/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3253)
15/09/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 943)
20/12/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1239)
22/08/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22176)
11/02/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22876)
25/10/1958 Water Treatment apparatus fitted


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 05/01/1924 09/02/1924 36 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6367
 
Gorton Works 29/05/1926 18/09/1926 113 days General Boiler number 1757 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/03/1928 07/04/1928 36 days General    
Gorton Works 04/01/1930 25/01/1930 22 days General Boiler number 1196 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/04/1932 09/04/1932 8 days General Boiler number 1692 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/11/1934 08/12/1934 15 days General Boiler number 1174 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/07/1937 17/07/1937 15 days General Boiler number 3303 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/07/1939 29/07/1939 8 days General Boiler number 549 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/12/1941 20/12/1941 20 days General Boiler number 3243 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/01/1944 29/01/1944 13 days General Boiler number 3253 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/08/1945 15/09/1945 36 days Heavy Boiler number 943 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/02/1947 01/03/1947 15 days Heavy    
Gorton Works 29/11/1947 20/12/1947 22 days General Boiler number 1239 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/05/1950 03/06/1950 15 days General Renumbered to BR 63667
 
Gorton Works 26/07/1952 16/08/1952 22 days Heavy Casual    
Gorton Works 08/08/1953 22/08/1953 15 days General Boiler number 22176 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/08/1953 04/09/1953 10 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 14/01/1956 11/02/1956 29 days General Boiler number 22876 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/02/1956 21/02/1956 4 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 11/10/1958 25/10/1958 15 days Unclassified Water Treatment apparatus fitted
 
Gorton Works 02/01/1959 02/01/1959 1 day No repairs    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1629
Built at Kitson, Works Number 5215
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
06/1920 Allocation      
06/1920 Renumbered Renumbered to 2956    
05/01/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1924. Dep: 09/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6367
   
09/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
09/02/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
29/05/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1926. Dep: 18/09/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1757 (Diagram 15)
   
03/03/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1928. Dep: 07/04/1928.    
04/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1930. Dep: 25/01/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1196 (Diagram 15)
   
02/04/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1932. Dep: 09/04/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1692 (Diagram 15)
   
24/11/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1934. Dep: 08/12/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1174 (Diagram 15)
   
01/01/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
03/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1937. Dep: 17/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3303 (Diagram 15)
   
22/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1939. Dep: 29/07/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 549 (Diagram 15)
   
28/02/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
01/12/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1941. Dep: 20/12/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3243 (Diagram 15)
   
17/01/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1944. Dep: 29/01/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3253 (Diagram 15)
   
23/07/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
11/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 11/08/1945. Dep: 15/09/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 943 (Diagram 15)
   
22/07/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
01/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3667    
08/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
15/02/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 15/02/1947. Dep: 01/03/1947.    
29/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1947. Dep: 20/12/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1239 (Diagram 15)
   
07/11/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD)    
13/11/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD)    
20/05/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1950. Dep: 03/06/1950.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63667
   
22/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
28/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
02/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
26/07/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 26/07/1952. Dep: 16/08/1952.    
08/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1953. Dep: 22/08/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22176 (Diagram 15)
   
26/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/08/1953. Dep: 04/09/1953.    
14/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1956. Dep: 11/02/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22876 (Diagram 15)
   
18/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/02/1956. Dep: 21/02/1956.    
11/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/10/1958. Dep: 25/10/1958.
Work undertaken:
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
   
02/01/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 02/01/1959. Dep: 02/01/1959.    
19/01/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63667 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev