Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 214 Today
» 1120 Yesterday
» 3603 Week
» 22504 Month
» 22504 Year
» 1687880 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1632 m/e 10/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6362   22/03/1924
War Dept. 779   18/10/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 479C
Works Number 5218
To Service During 10/1918
Taken into Stock 22/03/1924
Withdrawal Sat 18/10/1941 off Frodingham (FRO)
Service Life 23 yrs , 18 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 779 and sent to the Middle East

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1918
GOR Gorton on 29/03/1924
DON Doncaster on 13/12/1924
IMM Immingham on 07/12/1929
KEA Keadby on 17/03/1932
FRO Frodingham on 12/06/1932
   Withdrawn on 18/10/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1336)
06/12/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1404)
30/11/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1363)
06/02/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1438)
13/10/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1181)
30/01/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 549)
22/07/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3243)
11/10/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3353)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 08/03/1924 22/03/1924 15 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6362
 
Gorton Works 02/08/1924 06/12/1924 127 days General
Boiler number 1404 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/06/1927 23/07/1927 50 days General  
Gorton Works 19/10/1929 30/11/1929 43 days General
Boiler number 1363 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/01/1932 06/02/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1438 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/10/1934 13/10/1934 8 days General
Boiler number 1181 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/01/1937 30/01/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 549 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/07/1939 22/07/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 3243 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/09/1941 11/10/1941 13 days General
Boiler number 3353 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1632
Built at Kitson, Works Number 5218
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
22/03/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
29/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
13/12/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
07/12/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
17/03/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
12/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
18/10/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 779 from Frodingham (FRO)    
18/10/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 779    

prev prev