|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 08/03/1924 | 22/03/1924 | 15 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6362 |
||
Gorton Works | 02/08/1924 | 06/12/1924 | 127 days | General | Boiler number 1404 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/06/1927 | 23/07/1927 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 19/10/1929 | 30/11/1929 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1363 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/01/1932 | 06/02/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1438 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/10/1934 | 13/10/1934 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1181 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/01/1937 | 30/01/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 549 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/07/1939 | 22/07/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3243 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/09/1941 | 11/10/1941 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 3353 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1632 Built at Kitson, Works Number 5218 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
08/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/03/1924. Dep: 22/03/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6362 |
||
22/03/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
29/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
02/08/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1924. Dep: 06/12/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1404 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/12/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
04/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1927. Dep: 23/07/1927. | ||
19/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1929. Dep: 30/11/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1363 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/12/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
23/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1932. Dep: 06/02/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1438 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/03/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Keadby (KEA) | ||
12/06/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
06/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1934. Dep: 13/10/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1181 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1937. Dep: 30/01/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 549 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1939. Dep: 22/07/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3243 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1941. Dep: 11/10/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3353 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/10/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 779 from Frodingham (FRO) | ||
18/10/1941 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 779 |