|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 29/03/1924 | 31/05/1924 | 64 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6341 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/05/1927 | 09/07/1927 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 31/08/1929 | 19/10/1929 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1486 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/06/1931 | 11/07/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 515 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/06/1933 | 24/06/1933 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1494 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/06/1935 | 06/07/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1235 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/08/1937 | 28/08/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3208 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/01/1940 | 03/02/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3381 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/09/1942 | 26/09/1942 | 12 days | General | Boiler number 3331 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/06/1945 | 11/08/1945 | 71 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5041 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/07/1947 | 07/08/1947 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 5034 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/09/1949 | 08/10/1949 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 5084 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63689 |
||
Gorton Works | 22/04/1951 | 26/05/1951 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 28812 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/05/1951 | 03/06/1951 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 05/02/1953 | 28/02/1953 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28284 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/04/1953 | 09/05/1953 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 24/03/1954 | 23/04/1954 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 02/03/1955 | 07/04/1955 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28257 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/06/1955 | 02/07/1955 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 05/03/1956 | 20/04/1956 | 47 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 13/03/1957 | 13/04/1957 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28390 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/07/1959 | 21/08/1959 | 44 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 08/09/1959 | 11/09/1959 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 15/06/1960 | 08/07/1960 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 02/03/1962 | 12/04/1962 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 28383 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
18/03/1962 | Gorton Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: E26011/34, E27005, 63689, 63720/81, 90013/101/30/3/280/300/1/2, 90447/84, 90541/611/65/730, 92014/92/102. Outside Erecting Shop: E26000/26/33/47, 64744, 63612, 63730/62, 63775, 90103. | SLS/196204 |
31/10/1962 | Annesley MPD | The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. | SLS/196212 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1671 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3715 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
06/1920 | Allocation | |||
06/1920 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2971 | ||
29/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1924. Dep: 31/05/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6341 |
||
29/05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
31/05/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
28/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1927. Dep: 09/07/1927. | ||
31/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1929. Dep: 19/10/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1486 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1931. Dep: 11/07/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 515 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1933. Dep: 24/06/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1494 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1935. Dep: 06/07/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1235 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1937. Dep: 28/08/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3208 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1940. Dep: 03/02/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3381 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1942. Dep: 26/09/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3331 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1945. Dep: 11/08/1945. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5041 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
11/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3689 | ||
06/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1947. Dep: 07/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5034 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1949. Dep: 08/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5084 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63689 |
||
16/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
22/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1951. Dep: 26/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28812 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/05/1951. Dep: 03/06/1951. | ||
05/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1953. Dep: 28/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28284 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/04/1953. Dep: 09/05/1953. | ||
24/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/03/1954. Dep: 23/04/1954. | ||
02/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1955. Dep: 07/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28257 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/06/1955. Dep: 02/07/1955. | ||
05/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/03/1956. Dep: 20/04/1956. | ||
13/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1957. Dep: 13/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28390 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/07/1959. Dep: 21/08/1959. | ||
08/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/09/1959. Dep: 11/09/1959. | ||
15/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/06/1960. Dep: 08/07/1960. | ||
02/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1962. Dep: 12/04/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28383 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63689 from Annesley (16D) |