Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 53 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4968 Week
» 16205 Month
» 249125 Year
» 1914501 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1673 m/e 04/1918
London and North Western Railway 2959 m/e 06/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6342   01/03/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3691   17/12/1946
British Railways 63691 w/e 09/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/304/1918
O4/8 (2-8-0)16/03/1956
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E105
Works Number 3717
To Service During 04/1918
Taken into Stock 01/03/1924
Withdrawal Sun 20/06/1965 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Service Life 47 yrs, 2 mths , 20 dys

Disposal
Scrapping T W Ward (Killamarsh)

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to T W Ward, Killamarsh, 8/65

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1918
91LNWR   (on loan)   06/1920
GOR   Gorton on 04/03/1924
MAR   March on 14/03/1924
DON   Doncaster on 24/03/1924
LIN   Lincoln on 12/12/1943
TUX   Tuxford on 14/12/1947
37A   Ardsley on 27/09/1953
39B   Sheffield Darnall on 20/12/1953
40D   Tuxford on 09/01/1955
41J   Langwith Junction on 01/02/1959
     Withdrawn on 20/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC TUX Tuxford w/e 20/12/1947
ALLOC 37A Ardsley 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 39B Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 26/12/1953
ALLOC 40D Tuxford 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 21/02/1959
WDN   w/e 20/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1528)
12/10/1926 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1773)
04/11/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1850)
18/11/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1133)
15/12/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1245)
26/12/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1252)
21/01/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1943)
01/03/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1206)
21/08/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3241)
16/02/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 930)
10/09/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3233)
09/10/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3315)
07/04/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22175)
16/05/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22134)
16/03/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 28891)
15/11/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 28976)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 04/02/1924 01/03/1924 27 days Heavy Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6342
 
Gorton Works 25/06/1926 12/10/1926 110 days General Boiler number 1773 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/08/1928 23/10/1928 54 days General    
Gorton Works 04/09/1930 04/11/1930 62 days General Boiler number 1850 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/10/1932 18/11/1932 32 days General Boiler number 1133 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/11/1934 15/12/1934 26 days General Boiler number 1245 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/11/1936 26/12/1936 42 days General Boiler number 1252 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/12/1938 21/01/1939 49 days General Boiler number 1943 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/02/1941 01/03/1941 21 days General Boiler number 1206 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/07/1943 21/08/1943 35 days General Boiler number 3241 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/01/1945 24/02/1945 37 days General    
Gorton Works 27/12/1945 16/02/1946 52 days General Boiler number 930 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/04/1947 10/09/1947 163 days Heavy Boiler number 3233 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/08/1948 09/10/1948 41 days General Boiler number 3315 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63691
 
Gorton Works 01/03/1951 07/04/1951 38 days General Boiler number 22175 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/04/1951 17/04/1951 9 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 23/04/1953 16/05/1953 24 days General Boiler number 22134 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/06/1954 03/07/1954 11 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 28/01/1956 16/03/1956 49 days General Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28891 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/04/1956 14/04/1956 10 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 07/10/1958 15/11/1958 40 days General Boiler number 28976 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/05/1962 29/06/1962 44 days Heavy Intermediate    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1673
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3717
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
06/1920 Allocation      
06/1920 Renumbered Renumbered to 2959    
04/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 04/02/1924. Dep: 01/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6342
   
01/03/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
04/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
14/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
24/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
25/06/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1926. Dep: 12/10/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1773 (Diagram 15)
   
31/08/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1928. Dep: 23/10/1928.    
04/09/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1930. Dep: 04/11/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1850 (Diagram 15)
   
18/10/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1932. Dep: 18/11/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1133 (Diagram 15)
   
20/11/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1934. Dep: 15/12/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1245 (Diagram 15)
   
15/11/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1936. Dep: 26/12/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1252 (Diagram 15)
   
04/12/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1938. Dep: 21/01/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1943 (Diagram 15)
   
09/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1941. Dep: 01/03/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1206 (Diagram 15)
   
18/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1943. Dep: 21/08/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3241 (Diagram 15)
   
12/12/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
19/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1945. Dep: 24/02/1945.    
27/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1945. Dep: 16/02/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 930 (Diagram 15)
   
17/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3691    
01/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 01/04/1947. Dep: 10/09/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3233 (Diagram 15)
   
14/12/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (TUX)    
30/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1948. Dep: 09/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3315 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63691
   
01/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1951. Dep: 07/04/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22175 (Diagram 15)
   
09/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/04/1951. Dep: 17/04/1951.    
23/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1953. Dep: 16/05/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22134 (Diagram 15)
   
27/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
20/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B)    
23/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/06/1954. Dep: 03/07/1954.    
09/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (40D)    
28/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1956. Dep: 16/03/1956.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28891 (Diagram 15)
   
05/04/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/04/1956. Dep: 14/04/1956.    
07/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1958. Dep: 15/11/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28976 (Diagram 15)
   
01/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
17/05/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/05/1962. Dep: 29/06/1962.    
20/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63691 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev