|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 04/02/1924 | 01/03/1924 | 27 days | Heavy | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6342 |
||
Gorton Works | 25/06/1926 | 12/10/1926 | 110 days | General | Boiler number 1773 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/08/1928 | 23/10/1928 | 54 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 04/09/1930 | 04/11/1930 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 1850 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/10/1932 | 18/11/1932 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 1133 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/11/1934 | 15/12/1934 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 1245 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/11/1936 | 26/12/1936 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 1252 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/12/1938 | 21/01/1939 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 1943 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/02/1941 | 01/03/1941 | 21 days | General | Boiler number 1206 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/07/1943 | 21/08/1943 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 3241 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/01/1945 | 24/02/1945 | 37 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 27/12/1945 | 16/02/1946 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 930 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/04/1947 | 10/09/1947 | 163 days | Heavy | Boiler number 3233 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/08/1948 | 09/10/1948 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 3315 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63691 |
||
Gorton Works | 01/03/1951 | 07/04/1951 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 22175 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/04/1951 | 17/04/1951 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 23/04/1953 | 16/05/1953 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 22134 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/06/1954 | 03/07/1954 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 28/01/1956 | 16/03/1956 | 49 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28891 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/04/1956 | 14/04/1956 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 07/10/1958 | 15/11/1958 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 28976 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/05/1962 | 29/06/1962 | 44 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1673 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3717 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
06/1920 | Allocation | |||
06/1920 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2959 | ||
04/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 04/02/1924. Dep: 01/03/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6342 |
||
01/03/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
04/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
14/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
24/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
25/06/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1926. Dep: 12/10/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1773 (Diagram 15) |
||
31/08/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1928. Dep: 23/10/1928. | ||
04/09/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1930. Dep: 04/11/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1850 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1932. Dep: 18/11/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1133 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1934. Dep: 15/12/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1245 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1936. Dep: 26/12/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1252 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1938. Dep: 21/01/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1943 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1941. Dep: 01/03/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1206 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1943. Dep: 21/08/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3241 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/12/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
19/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1945. Dep: 24/02/1945. | ||
27/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1945. Dep: 16/02/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 930 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3691 | ||
01/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 01/04/1947. Dep: 10/09/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3233 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/12/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (TUX) | ||
30/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1948. Dep: 09/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3315 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63691 |
||
01/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1951. Dep: 07/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22175 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/04/1951. Dep: 17/04/1951. | ||
23/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1953. Dep: 16/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22134 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
20/12/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) | ||
23/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/06/1954. Dep: 03/07/1954. | ||
09/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) | ||
28/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1956. Dep: 16/03/1956. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28891 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/04/1956. Dep: 14/04/1956. | ||
07/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1958. Dep: 15/11/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28976 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/02/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
17/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/05/1962. Dep: 29/06/1962. | ||
20/06/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63691 from Langwith Junction (41J) |