Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 81 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 81 Week
» 11226 Month
» 111011 Year
» 1776387 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1676 m/e 05/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6340   22/03/1924
War Dept. 754   05/10/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E105
Works Number 3720
To Service During 05/1918
Taken into Stock 22/03/1924
Withdrawal Sun 05/10/1941 off Immingham (IMM)
Service Life 23 yrs, 5 mths , 5 dys

Disposal

Notes
Notes Renumbered 754 and sent to the Middle East

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1918
GOR   Gorton on 29/03/1924
IMM   Immingham on 08/04/1924
MAR   March on 04/07/1925
IMM   Immingham on 09/07/1925
     Withdrawn on 05/10/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1944)
09/01/1926 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1093)
14/06/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1687)
03/12/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1870)
08/06/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1287)
12/06/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1853)
02/09/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1456)
27/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3276)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 02/02/1924 22/03/1924 50 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6340
 
Gorton Works 28/11/1925 09/01/1926 43 days General Boiler number 1093 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/03/1928 21/04/1928 50 days General    
Gorton Works 10/05/1930 14/06/1930 36 days General Boiler number 1687 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/11/1932 03/12/1932 8 days General Boiler number 1870 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/06/1935 08/06/1935 8 days General Boiler number 1287 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/05/1937 12/06/1937 15 days General Boiler number 1853 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/08/1939 02/09/1939 15 days General Boiler number 1456 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/05/1940 25/05/1940 22 days Heavy    
Gorton Works 16/09/1941 27/09/1941 12 days General Boiler number 3276 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1676
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3720
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
02/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1924. Dep: 22/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6340
   
22/03/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
29/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
08/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
04/07/1925 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
09/07/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
28/11/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1925. Dep: 09/01/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1093 (Diagram 15)
   
03/03/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1928. Dep: 21/04/1928.    
10/05/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1930. Dep: 14/06/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1687 (Diagram 15)
   
26/11/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1932. Dep: 03/12/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1870 (Diagram 15)
   
01/06/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1935. Dep: 08/06/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1287 (Diagram 15)
   
29/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1937. Dep: 12/06/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1853 (Diagram 15)
   
19/08/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1939. Dep: 02/09/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1456 (Diagram 15)
   
04/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 04/05/1940. Dep: 25/05/1940.    
16/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1941. Dep: 27/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3276 (Diagram 15)
   
05/10/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 754 from Immingham (IMM)    
05/10/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 754    

prev prev