Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 357 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 5968 Week
» 17014 Month
» 17014 Year
» 1682390 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1677 m/e 05/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6496   19/09/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3695   02/06/1946
British Railways 63695 w/e 29/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E105
Works Number 3721
To Service During 05/1918
Taken into Stock 19/09/1925
Withdrawal Sun 09/12/1962 off Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 44 yrs, 7 mths , 9 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 7/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1918
GOR Gorton on 19/09/1925
NWE New England on 25/09/1925
ANN Annesley on 26/01/1933
WFD Woodford Halse on 07/05/1944
LNG Langwith Junction on 07/04/1946
CLK Colwick on 27/10/1946
ANN Annesley on 04/07/1948
39A Gorton on 02/07/1950
39B Sheffield Darnall on 13/06/1954
   Withdrawn on 09/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 10/07/1948
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 02/07/1950
ALLOC 39B Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 19/06/1954
WDN   on 09/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1743)
10/12/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1850)
02/05/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1259)
31/12/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1201)
21/01/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1059)
04/01/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1883)
20/03/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3223)
12/06/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 930)
19/01/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1131)
29/05/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3390)
17/06/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3407)
20/12/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22883)
08/10/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22892)
13/12/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22117)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 06/06/1925 19/09/1925 106 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6496
 
Gorton Works 08/10/1927 12/11/1927 36 days General  
Gorton Works 22/02/1930 29/03/1930 36 days General  
Gorton Works 03/12/1932 10/12/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1850 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/03/1935 02/05/1935 62 days General
Boiler number 1259 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/12/1936 31/12/1936 13 days General
Boiler number 1201 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/01/1939 21/01/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 1059 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/12/1940 04/01/1941 15 days General
Boiler number 1883 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 16/02/1943 20/03/1943 33 days General
Boiler number 3223 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 19/05/1943 12/06/1943 25 days Heavy
Boiler number 930 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/12/1945 19/01/1946 29 days General
Boiler number 1131 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/05/1948 29/05/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 3390 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63695
 
Gorton Works 03/06/1950 17/06/1950 15 days General
Boiler number 3407 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/12/1951 21/12/1951 2 days Light Casual
Tender changed
 
Gorton Works 29/11/1952 20/12/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 22883 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/09/1954 25/09/1954 22 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 03/09/1955 08/10/1955 36 days General
Boiler number 22892 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/11/1958 13/12/1958 29 days General
Boiler number 22117 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1677
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3721
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
19/09/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
19/09/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
25/09/1925 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
26/01/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
07/05/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
02/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3695    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
04/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B)    
09/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63695 from Sheffield Darnall (41A)    

prev prev