|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 30/05/1924 | 14/06/1924 | 16 days | Heavy | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6338 |
||
Gorton Works | 30/09/1925 | 05/11/1925 | 37 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/10/1927 | 22/11/1927 | 40 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/06/1930 | 29/07/1930 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 1676 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/09/1932 | 28/10/1932 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 1223 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/01/1935 | 02/03/1935 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1254 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/05/1937 | 19/06/1937 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 3296 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/11/1939 | 25/11/1939 | 14 days | General | Boiler number 3272 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/12/1941 | 17/01/1942 | 21 days | General | Boiler number 1006 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/03/1944 | 25/03/1944 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 1232 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/07/1946 | 14/09/1946 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 1006 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3697 |
||
Gorton Works | 13/11/1948 | 08/01/1949 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 805 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63697 |
||
Gorton Works | 13/06/1951 | 21/07/1951 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 22200 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/08/1954 | 04/09/1954 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 22262 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/03/1958 | 03/05/1958 | 55 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28893 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/04/1961 | 25/05/1961 | 28 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 21/06/1962 | 09/08/1962 | 50 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1679 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3723 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
06/1920 | Allocation | |||
06/1920 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2972 | ||
30/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 30/05/1924. Dep: 14/06/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6338 |
||
12/06/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
14/06/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
30/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1925. Dep: 05/11/1925. | ||
03/02/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
14/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1927. Dep: 22/11/1927. | ||
14/06/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1930. Dep: 29/07/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1676 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/09/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1932. Dep: 28/10/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1223 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1935. Dep: 02/03/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1254 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1937. Dep: 19/06/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3296 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1939. Dep: 25/11/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3272 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1941. Dep: 17/01/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1006 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
01/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1944. Dep: 25/03/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1232 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
07/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
30/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1946. Dep: 14/09/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1006 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3697 |
||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
13/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1948. Dep: 08/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 805 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63697 |
||
08/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
14/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
13/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1951. Dep: 21/07/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22200 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1954. Dep: 04/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22262 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1958. Dep: 03/05/1958. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28893 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
28/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/04/1961. Dep: 25/05/1961. | ||
21/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 21/06/1962. Dep: 09/08/1962. | ||
29/08/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63697 from Langwith Junction (41J) |