|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 09/02/1924 | 01/03/1924 | 22 days | Heavy | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6336 |
||
Gorton Works | 02/07/1926 | 16/07/1926 | 15 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 26/01/1929 | 02/02/1929 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1680 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/11/1930 | 06/12/1930 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1098 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/09/1933 | 16/09/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1242 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/10/1935 | 22/10/1935 | 6 days | General | Boiler number 1413 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/03/1938 | 05/04/1938 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3327 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/06/1940 | 12/07/1940 | 14 days | General | Boiler number 3302 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/03/1943 | 12/03/1943 | 11 days | General | Boiler number 3400 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/05/1945 | 23/06/1945 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 1070 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/11/1947 | 30/12/1947 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 1187 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/09/1950 | 06/10/1950 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 22116 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63703 |
||
Gorton Works | 23/01/1952 | 29/01/1952 | 7 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 05/12/1952 | 24/01/1953 | 51 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28838 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/12/1953 | 16/01/1954 | 34 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 14/03/1955 | 21/04/1955 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28381 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/09/1956 | 13/10/1956 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 20/11/1956 | 29/12/1956 | 40 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 13/02/1957 | 23/02/1957 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 22/05/1958 | 05/07/1958 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 28290 (Diagram 100A) Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 10/09/1958 | 13/09/1958 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 28/11/1958 | 20/12/1958 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 25/01/1962 | 24/02/1962 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1686 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3730 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/02/1924. Dep: 01/03/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6336 |
||
01/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
01/03/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
24/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
02/07/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1926. Dep: 16/07/1926. | ||
26/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1929. Dep: 02/02/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1680 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1930. Dep: 06/12/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1098 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/12/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
02/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1933. Dep: 16/09/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1242 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1935. Dep: 22/10/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1413 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1938. Dep: 05/04/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3327 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1940. Dep: 12/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3302 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/11/1940 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) | ||
01/02/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
02/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1943. Dep: 12/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3400 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
11/06/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
14/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1945. Dep: 23/06/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1070 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
01/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3703 | ||
23/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1947. Dep: 30/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1187 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
04/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1950. Dep: 06/10/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22116 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63703 |
||
23/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/01/1952. Dep: 29/01/1952. | ||
05/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1952. Dep: 24/01/1953. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28838 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/12/1953. Dep: 16/01/1954. | ||
14/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1955. Dep: 21/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28381 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/09/1956. Dep: 13/10/1956. | ||
20/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/11/1956. Dep: 29/12/1956. | ||
13/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/02/1957. Dep: 23/02/1957. | ||
22/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1958. Dep: 05/07/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28290 (Diagram 100A) Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
||
10/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/09/1958. Dep: 13/09/1958. | ||
28/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/11/1958. Dep: 20/12/1958. | ||
25/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/01/1962. Dep: 24/02/1962. | ||
31/01/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63703 from Langwith Junction (41J) |