|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 02/02/1924 | 16/02/1924 | 15 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6320 |
||
Gorton Works | 30/08/1924 | 27/12/1924 | 120 days | General | Boiler number 1155 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/11/1927 | 24/12/1927 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 08/02/1930 | 01/03/1930 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1217 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/05/1933 | 20/05/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1885 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/07/1935 | 10/08/1935 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 934 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/06/1937 | 10/07/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 940 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/07/1939 | 19/08/1939 | 24 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/5 Boiler number 3651 (Diagram 15A) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/07/1941 | 09/08/1941 | 12 days | General | Boiler number 639 (Diagram 15A) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/02/1944 | 26/02/1944 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3655 (Diagram 15A) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/11/1947 | 06/12/1947 | 29 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3667 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/07/1949 | 23/07/1949 | 22 days | Light Casual | After collision Renumbered to BR 63705 |
||
Gorton Works | 11/11/1950 | 25/11/1950 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22309 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/01/1953 | 07/02/1953 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22303 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/02/1953 | 12/02/1953 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 02/04/1955 | 30/04/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22305 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/05/1955 | 04/05/1955 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 22/12/1956 | 12/01/1957 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 07/06/1958 | 02/08/1958 | 57 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28970 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/08/1958 | 31/08/1958 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 10/02/1961 | 18/03/1961 | 37 days | Light Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1649 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3733 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
02/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/02/1924. Dep: 16/02/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6320 |
||
16/02/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
22/02/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
21/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
30/08/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1924. Dep: 27/12/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1155 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1927. Dep: 24/12/1927. | ||
08/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1930. Dep: 01/03/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1217 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1933. Dep: 20/05/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1885 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1935. Dep: 10/08/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 934 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1937. Dep: 10/07/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 940 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1939. Dep: 19/08/1939. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/5 Boiler number 3651 (Diagram 15A) |
||
29/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1941. Dep: 09/08/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 639 (Diagram 15A) |
||
05/09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
05/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1944. Dep: 26/02/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3655 (Diagram 15A) |
||
07/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
08/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3705 | ||
08/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1947. Dep: 06/12/1947. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3667 (Diagram 15D) |
||
22/12/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
29/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
03/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
02/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/07/1949. Dep: 23/07/1949. Work undertaken: After collision Renumbered to BR 63705 |
||
30/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
21/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
11/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1950. Dep: 25/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22309 (Diagram 15D) |
||
17/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
24/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1953. Dep: 07/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22303 (Diagram 15D) |
||
10/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/02/1953. Dep: 12/02/1953. | ||
02/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1955. Dep: 30/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22305 (Diagram 15D) |
||
02/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/05/1955. Dep: 04/05/1955. | ||
22/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/12/1956. Dep: 12/01/1957. | ||
07/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1958. Dep: 02/08/1958. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28970 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/08/1958. Dep: 31/08/1958. | ||
10/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 10/02/1961. Dep: 18/03/1961. | ||
14/04/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63705 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |