Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 78 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 78 Week
» 11223 Month
» 111008 Year
» 1776384 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1688 m/e 11/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6318   12/04/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3708   25/08/1946
British Railways 63708 w/e 29/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/311/1918
O4/7 (2-8-0)04/09/1942
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E106
Works Number 3736
To Service During 11/1918
Taken into Stock 12/04/1924
Withdrawal Sun 23/09/1962 off Immingham (40B)
Service Life 43 yrs, 10 mths , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Derby)

Notes
Notes Into Derby for cutting up 7/63

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1918
GOR   Gorton on 15/04/1924
DON   Doncaster on 12/11/1924
MAR   March on 15/08/1933
CAM   Cambridge on 22/12/1947
ARD   Ardsley on 27/11/1949
ARD   Ardsley w/e 03/12/1949
39A   Gorton on 11/06/1950
39A   Gorton m/e 30/06/1950
39B   Sheffield Darnall on 13/06/1954
40B   Immingham on 16/09/1956
     Withdrawn on 23/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CAM Cambridge w/e 27/12/1947
ALLOC ARD Ardsley w/e 03/12/1949
ALLOC 39A Gorton m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 39B Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 13/10/1956
WDN   on 23/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1416)
01/11/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1181)
31/08/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1317)
21/03/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 870)
22/07/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1308)
25/01/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1264)
25/01/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
01/10/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3249)
20/04/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 933)
04/09/1942 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3669)
23/09/1944 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3660)
12/04/1947 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3698)
30/09/1950 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22301)
11/10/1952 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22349)
07/05/1955 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22335)
25/10/1958 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22314)
25/10/1958 Water Treatment apparatus fitted


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 05/04/1924 12/04/1924 8 days Light Repair Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6318
 
Gorton Works 21/06/1924 01/11/1924 134 days General Boiler number 1181 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/04/1927 04/06/1927 43 days General    
Gorton Works 27/07/1929 31/08/1929 36 days General Boiler number 1317 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/03/1931 21/03/1931 15 days General Boiler number 870 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/07/1933 22/07/1933 8 days General Boiler number 1308 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/01/1936 25/01/1936 15 days General Boiler number 1264 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 30/01/1937 13/02/1937 15 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 27/08/1938 01/10/1938 36 days General Boiler number 3249 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/04/1940 20/04/1940 8 days General Boiler number 933 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 04/08/1942 04/09/1942 32 days General Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3669 (Diagram 15D)
 
Stratford Works 11/09/1942 26/09/1942 16 days Light Repair After collision
 
Gorton Works 09/11/1943 13/11/1943 5 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 12/09/1944 23/09/1944 12 days General Boiler number 3660 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 15/03/1947 12/04/1947 29 days General Boiler number 3698 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 08/05/1948 22/05/1948 15 days Light Repair Renumbered to BR 63708
 
Gorton Works 09/09/1950 30/09/1950 22 days General Boiler number 22301 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 02/10/1950 16/10/1950 15 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 27/09/1952 11/10/1952 15 days General Boiler number 22349 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 20/10/1952 13/11/1952 25 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 09/04/1955 07/05/1955 29 days General Boiler number 22335 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 22/06/1957 13/07/1957 22 days Heavy Casual    
Gorton Works 16/07/1957 18/07/1957 3 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 04/10/1958 25/10/1958 22 days General Boiler number 22314 (Diagram 15D)
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1688
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3736
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
05/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/04/1924. Dep: 12/04/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6318
   
12/04/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
15/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
21/06/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1924. Dep: 01/11/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1181 (Diagram 15)
   
12/11/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
23/04/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1927. Dep: 04/06/1927.    
27/07/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1929. Dep: 31/08/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1317 (Diagram 15)
   
07/03/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1931. Dep: 21/03/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 870 (Diagram 15)
   
15/07/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1933. Dep: 22/07/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1308 (Diagram 15)
   
15/08/1933 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
11/01/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1936. Dep: 25/01/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1264 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
30/01/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/01/1937. Dep: 13/02/1937.    
27/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1938. Dep: 01/10/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3249 (Diagram 15)
   
13/04/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1940. Dep: 20/04/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 933 (Diagram 15)
   
04/08/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1942. Dep: 04/09/1942.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3669 (Diagram 15D)
   
11/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/09/1942. Dep: 26/09/1942.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
09/11/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/11/1943. Dep: 13/11/1943.    
12/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1944. Dep: 23/09/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3660 (Diagram 15D)
   
25/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3708    
15/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1947. Dep: 12/04/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3698 (Diagram 15D)
   
22/12/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
08/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/05/1948. Dep: 22/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63708
   
27/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
03/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
11/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
30/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
09/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1950. Dep: 30/09/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22301 (Diagram 15D)
   
02/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/10/1950. Dep: 16/10/1950.    
27/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1952. Dep: 11/10/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22349 (Diagram 15D)
   
20/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/10/1952. Dep: 13/11/1952.    
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B)    
09/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1955. Dep: 07/05/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22335 (Diagram 15D)
   
16/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
22/06/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 22/06/1957. Dep: 13/07/1957.    
16/07/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/07/1957. Dep: 18/07/1957.    
04/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1958. Dep: 25/10/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22314 (Diagram 15D)
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
   
23/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63708 from Immingham (40B)    

prev prev