|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 19/01/1924 | 26/01/1924 | 8 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6276 |
||
Gorton Works | 21/06/1924 | 06/09/1924 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 1489 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/04/1927 | 14/05/1927 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 20/04/1929 | 29/06/1929 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 1494 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/02/1931 | 07/03/1931 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1225 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/04/1933 | 22/04/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1096 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/06/1935 | 15/06/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1291 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/10/1936 | 17/10/1936 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3264 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/02/1939 | 25/02/1939 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1042 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/08/1941 | 16/08/1941 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 1076 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/03/1944 | 08/04/1944 | 34 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 5102 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/05/1946 | 25/05/1946 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3665 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3758 |
||
Gorton Works | 31/07/1948 | 21/08/1948 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3690 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63758 |
||
Gorton Works | 31/03/1951 | 05/05/1951 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22318 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/06/1953 | 11/07/1953 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22309 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/07/1953 | 20/07/1953 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 30/07/1955 | 27/08/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22311 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/12/1956 | 19/01/1957 | 50 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 22316 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/02/1959 | 21/03/1959 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22332 (Diagram 15D) Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 23/05/1962 | 23/05/1962 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1917 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1847 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21824 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
19/01/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/01/1924. Dep: 26/01/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6276 |
||
26/01/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
06/02/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
21/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1924. Dep: 06/09/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1489 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1927. Dep: 14/05/1927. | ||
20/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1929. Dep: 29/06/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1494 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1931. Dep: 07/03/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1225 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1933. Dep: 22/04/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1096 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1935. Dep: 15/06/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1291 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1936. Dep: 17/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3264 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
18/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1939. Dep: 25/02/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1042 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1941. Dep: 16/08/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1076 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1944. Dep: 08/04/1944. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 5102 (Diagram 15D) |
||
06/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
03/02/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
11/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1946. Dep: 25/05/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3665 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3758 |
||
31/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1948. Dep: 21/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3690 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63758 |
||
25/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
31/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1951. Dep: 05/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22318 (Diagram 15D) |
||
20/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1953. Dep: 11/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22309 (Diagram 15D) |
||
14/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/07/1953. Dep: 20/07/1953. | ||
09/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) | ||
30/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1955. Dep: 27/08/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22311 (Diagram 15D) |
||
01/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 01/12/1956. Dep: 19/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22316 (Diagram 15D) |
||
01/02/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
28/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1959. Dep: 21/03/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22332 (Diagram 15D) Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
||
01/05/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
23/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 23/05/1962. Dep: 23/05/1962. | ||
24/05/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63758 from Immingham (40B) |