Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 48 Today
» 904 Yesterday
» 5579 Week
» 7317 Month
» 134760 Year
» 1800136 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1854 m/e 03/1918
London and North Western Railway 2868 m/e 09/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6580   19/05/1928
War Dept. 765   20/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L692
Works Number 21831
To Service During 03/1918
Taken into Stock 19/05/1928
Withdrawal Sat 20/09/1941 off Heaton (HTN)
Service Life 23 yrs, 6 mths , 22 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Disposal

Notes
Notes Renumbered 765 and sent to the Middle East

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1918
91LNWR   (on loan)   09/1919
ROD       08/1921
YK   York (North) on 19/05/1928
HLS   Hull Springhead on 05/10/1929
HLD   Hull Dairycoates on 11/07/1933
CUD   Cudworth on 30/10/1936
HTN   Heaton on 01/04/1940
     Withdrawn on 20/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 871)
01/07/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1036)
23/11/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1217)
14/05/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1413)
25/01/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3341)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 17/03/1928 19/05/1928 64 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6580
 
Darlington Works 29/09/1930 14/11/1930 47 days General    
Gorton Works 24/06/1933 01/07/1933 8 days General Boiler number 1036 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/11/1935 23/11/1935 15 days General Boiler number 1217 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/04/1938 14/05/1938 22 days General Boiler number 1413 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/01/1941 25/01/1941 15 days General Boiler number 3341 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1854
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21831
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2868    
08/1921 Allocation      
17/03/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1928. Dep: 19/05/1928.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6580
   
19/05/1928 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
19/05/1928 To Stock To LNER stock    
05/10/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
29/09/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1930. Dep: 14/11/1930.    
24/06/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1933. Dep: 01/07/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1036 (Diagram 15)
   
11/07/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
09/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1935. Dep: 23/11/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1217 (Diagram 15)
   
30/10/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD)    
23/04/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1938. Dep: 14/05/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1413 (Diagram 15)
   
01/04/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
11/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1941. Dep: 25/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3341 (Diagram 15)
   
20/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 765 from Heaton (HTN)    
20/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 765    

prev prev