Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 40 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 858 Week
» 17809 Month
» 170762 Year
» 1836138 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1856 m/e 03/1918
Great Central Railway 1272c   12/01/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6272   21/06/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3763   01/04/1946
British Railways 63763 w/e 21/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/303/1918
O4/8 (2-8-0)03/10/1953
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L692
Works Number 21833
To Service During 03/1918
Taken into Stock 12/01/1924
Withdrawal Sat 08/02/1964 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Service Life 45 yrs, 11 mths , 10 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 6/3/64

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1918
GOR   Gorton on 16/01/1924
ARD   Ardsley on 13/09/1924
SHF   Sheffield Neepsend on 30/08/1926
STV   Staveley (G.C.) m/e 1928
RET   Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 28/02/1929
36D   Barnsley on 18/03/1951
36D   Barnsley m/e 31/03/1951
41J   Langwith Junction on 29/11/1959
     Withdrawn on 08/02/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36D Barnsley m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 26/12/1959
WDN   on 08/02/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1152)
21/06/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1139)
08/02/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1953)
23/07/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 515)
09/07/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1600)
28/10/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1024)
13/08/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3202)
19/08/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3205)
04/11/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 862)
24/01/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1020)
06/05/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1082)
25/05/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3256)
21/08/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3237)
06/01/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22149)
03/10/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28326)
05/01/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28328)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 29/12/1923 12/01/1924 15 days Light Repair Renumbered to GCR 1272c
 
Gorton Works 12/04/1924 21/06/1924 71 days General Boiler number 1139 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6272
 
Gorton Works 13/01/1928 08/02/1928 27 days General Boiler number 1953 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/03/1929 23/07/1929 119 days General Boiler number 515 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/05/1931 09/07/1931 57 days General Boiler number 1600 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/09/1933 28/10/1933 39 days General Boiler number 1024 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/07/1935 13/08/1935 42 days General Boiler number 3202 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/07/1937 19/08/1937 22 days General Boiler number 3205 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/10/1939 04/11/1939 35 days General Boiler number 862 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/01/1942 24/01/1942 24 days General Boiler number 1020 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/03/1944 06/05/1944 38 days General Boiler number 1082 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/04/1946 25/05/1946 54 days General Boiler number 3256 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/07/1948 21/08/1948 35 days General Boiler number 3237 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63763
 
Gorton Works 27/11/1950 06/01/1951 41 days General Boiler number 22149 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/08/1953 03/10/1953 53 days General Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28326 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 06/10/1953 15/10/1953 10 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 01/12/1956 05/01/1957 36 days General Boiler number 28328 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 11/01/1957 16/01/1957 6 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 15/06/1960 17/08/1960 64 days Heavy Intermediate    
Gorton Works 06/09/1960 07/10/1960 32 days Unclassified    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1856
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21833
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
29/12/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/12/1923. Dep: 12/01/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to GCR 1272c
   
12/01/1924 To Stock To GCR stock    
16/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
12/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1924. Dep: 21/06/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1139 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6272
   
13/09/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
30/08/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
1928 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
13/01/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1928. Dep: 08/02/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1953 (Diagram 15)
   
28/02/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
27/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1929. Dep: 23/07/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 515 (Diagram 15)
   
14/05/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1931. Dep: 09/07/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1600 (Diagram 15)
   
20/09/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1933. Dep: 28/10/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1024 (Diagram 15)
   
03/07/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1935. Dep: 13/08/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3202 (Diagram 15)
   
29/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1937. Dep: 19/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3205 (Diagram 15)
   
01/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1939. Dep: 04/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 862 (Diagram 15)
   
01/01/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1942. Dep: 24/01/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1020 (Diagram 15)
   
30/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1944. Dep: 06/05/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1082 (Diagram 15)
   
01/04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3763    
02/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1946. Dep: 25/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3256 (Diagram 15)
   
18/07/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1948. Dep: 21/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3237 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63763
   
27/11/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1950. Dep: 06/01/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22149 (Diagram 15)
   
18/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (36D)    
31/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (36D)    
12/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1953. Dep: 03/10/1953.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28326 (Diagram 100A)
   
06/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/10/1953. Dep: 15/10/1953.    
01/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1956. Dep: 05/01/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28328 (Diagram 100A)
   
11/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/01/1957. Dep: 16/01/1957.    
29/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
15/06/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/06/1960. Dep: 17/08/1960.    
06/09/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/09/1960. Dep: 07/10/1960.    
08/02/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63763 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev