|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 12/05/1928 | 26/05/1928 | 15 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6581 |
||
Darlington Works | 08/04/1930 | 05/07/1930 | 89 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 05/08/1933 | 03/10/1933 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 1307 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/08/1935 | 14/09/1935 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1020 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/04/1937 | 01/05/1937 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1314 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/06/1938 | 02/07/1938 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 42 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/12/1939 | 06/01/1940 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 949 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/03/1942 | 18/04/1942 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 855 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/05/1944 | 24/06/1944 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1285 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/02/1946 | 09/03/1946 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 3351 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/05/1948 | 12/06/1948 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 3329 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63764 |
||
Gorton Works | 14/09/1949 | 08/10/1949 | 25 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 16/06/1950 | 09/08/1950 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 3263 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/10/1952 | 15/11/1952 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 22185 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/01/1955 | 19/02/1955 | 41 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 21/12/1955 | 04/02/1956 | 46 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 07/02/1958 | 08/03/1958 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 22172 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/02/1962 | 17/03/1962 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 22233 (Diagram 15) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
18/03/1962 | Gorton MPD | On Shed ex-Works : 63704/64, 90293/305/68. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1857 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21834 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
12/1919 | Allocation | |||
12/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2932 | ||
06/1920 | Allocation | |||
06/1920 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2952 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
12/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1928. Dep: 26/05/1928. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6581 |
||
26/05/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
26/05/1928 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
27/09/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
08/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1930. Dep: 05/07/1930. | ||
05/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1933. Dep: 03/10/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1307 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1935. Dep: 14/09/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1020 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
03/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1937. Dep: 01/05/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1314 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1938. Dep: 02/07/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 42 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1939. Dep: 06/01/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 949 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/05/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
28/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1942. Dep: 18/04/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 855 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1944. Dep: 24/06/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1285 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
07/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1946. Dep: 09/03/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3351 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
16/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3764 | ||
03/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1948. Dep: 12/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3329 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63764 |
||
14/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 14/09/1949. Dep: 08/10/1949. | ||
16/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1950. Dep: 09/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3263 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
16/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1952. Dep: 15/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22185 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/01/1955. Dep: 19/02/1955. | ||
15/05/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
21/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/12/1955. Dep: 04/02/1956. | ||
07/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1958. Dep: 08/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22172 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
20/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
08/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1962. Dep: 17/03/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22233 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/03/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
27/02/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63764 from Doncaster (36A) |