Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 34 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2960 Week
» 4698 Month
» 132141 Year
» 1797517 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1862 m/e 04/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6583   28/01/1928
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3769   08/09/1946
British Railways 63769 w/e 02/07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L692
Works Number 21839
To Service During 04/1918
Taken into Stock 24/01/1928
Withdrawal Fri 06/03/1959 off Doncaster (36A)
Service Life 40 yrs, 11 mths , 3 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1918
DON   Doncaster on 24/01/1928
HLD   Hull Dairycoates on 28/01/1928
HLS   Hull Springhead on 24/03/1930
HTN   Heaton on 24/02/1940
TDK   Tyne Dock on 23/07/1945
HLD   Hull Dairycoates on 06/02/1949
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 12/02/1949
36A   Doncaster on 02/09/1951
36A   Doncaster w/e 08/09/1951
     Withdrawn on 06/03/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 12/02/1949
LOAN 36A Doncaster on 02/09/1951
ALLOC 36A Doncaster w/e 08/09/1951
WDN   on 06/03/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1264)
11/02/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 859)
16/02/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 822)
03/04/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3281)
23/12/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1955)
25/04/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1081)
15/04/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3306)
05/04/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3245)
02/07/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1941)
08/12/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22231)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 15/10/1927 28/01/1928 106 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6583
 
Darlington Works 21/02/1930 17/04/1930 56 days General    
Gorton Works 28/01/1933 11/02/1933 15 days General Boiler number 859 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/02/1935 16/02/1935 8 days General Boiler number 822 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/03/1937 03/04/1937 15 days General Boiler number 3281 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/12/1939 23/12/1939 8 days General Boiler number 1955 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/04/1942 25/04/1942 15 days General Boiler number 1081 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/03/1944 15/04/1944 22 days General Boiler number 3306 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/12/1945 05/01/1946 15 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 15/03/1947 05/04/1947 22 days General Boiler number 3245 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/06/1949 02/07/1949 29 days General Boiler number 1941 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63769
 
Gorton Works 17/11/1951 08/12/1951 22 days General Boiler number 22231 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/12/1954 22/01/1955 50 days Heavy    
Gorton Works 16/09/1957 14/12/1957 90 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 24/12/1957 08/01/1958 16 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 25/02/1959 25/02/1959 1 day No repairs    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1862
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21839
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
15/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1927. Dep: 28/01/1928.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6583
   
24/01/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
24/01/1928 To Stock To ROD stock    
28/01/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
21/02/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1930. Dep: 17/04/1930.    
24/03/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
28/01/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1933. Dep: 11/02/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 859 (Diagram 15)
   
09/02/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1935. Dep: 16/02/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 822 (Diagram 15)
   
20/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1937. Dep: 03/04/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3281 (Diagram 15)
   
16/12/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1939. Dep: 23/12/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1955 (Diagram 15)
   
24/02/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
11/04/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1942. Dep: 25/04/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1081 (Diagram 15)
   
25/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1944. Dep: 15/04/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3306 (Diagram 15)
   
23/07/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
22/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/12/1945. Dep: 05/01/1946.    
08/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3769    
15/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1947. Dep: 05/04/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3245 (Diagram 15)
   
06/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
12/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
04/06/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1949. Dep: 02/07/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1941 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63769
   
02/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
17/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1951. Dep: 08/12/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22231 (Diagram 15)
   
04/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 04/12/1954. Dep: 22/01/1955.    
16/09/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/09/1957. Dep: 14/12/1957.    
24/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/12/1957. Dep: 08/01/1958.    
25/02/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 25/02/1959. Dep: 25/02/1959.    
06/03/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63769 from Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev