Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 805 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6205 Week
» 24257 Month
» 257177 Year
» 1922553 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1867 m/e 04/1918
London and North Western Railway 2935 m/e 12/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6514   27/03/1926
War Dept. 725   20/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L692
Works Number 21844
To Service During 04/1918
Taken into Stock 27/03/1926
Withdrawal Sat 20/09/1941 off York (North) (YK)
Service Life 23 yrs, 5 mths , 20 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Disposal

Notes
Notes Renumbered 725 and sent to the Middle East via Glasgow, 17/9/41

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1918
91LNWR   (on loan)   12/1919
ROD       08/1921
GOR   Gorton on 27/03/1926
SHF   Sheffield Neepsend on 06/04/1926
YK   York (North) on 31/08/1940
     Withdrawn on 20/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1111)
22/11/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1874)
18/03/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1205)
04/05/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 938)
27/02/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1319)
13/05/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3279)
05/07/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3362)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 02/01/1926 27/03/1926 85 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6514
 
Gorton Works 20/10/1928 24/11/1928 36 days General    
Gorton Works 01/11/1930 22/11/1930 22 days General Boiler number 1874 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/03/1933 18/03/1933 8 days General Boiler number 1205 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/04/1935 04/05/1935 15 days General Boiler number 938 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/02/1937 27/02/1937 8 days General Boiler number 1319 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/04/1939 13/05/1939 15 days General Boiler number 3279 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/06/1941 05/07/1941 15 days General Boiler number 3362 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1867
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21844
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/1919 Allocation      
12/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2935    
08/1921 Allocation      
02/01/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1926. Dep: 27/03/1926.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6514
   
27/03/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
27/03/1926 To Stock To LNER stock    
06/04/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
20/10/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1928. Dep: 24/11/1928.    
01/11/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1930. Dep: 22/11/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1874 (Diagram 15)
   
11/03/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1933. Dep: 18/03/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1205 (Diagram 15)
   
20/04/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1935. Dep: 04/05/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 938 (Diagram 15)
   
20/02/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1937. Dep: 27/02/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1319 (Diagram 15)
   
29/04/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1939. Dep: 13/05/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3279 (Diagram 15)
   
31/08/1940 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
21/06/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1941. Dep: 05/07/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3362 (Diagram 15)
   
20/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 725 from York (North) (YK)    
20/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 725    

prev prev