Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 465 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5452 Week
» 13567 Month
» 141010 Year
» 1806386 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1868 m/e 04/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6268   29/03/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3774   27/04/1946
British Railways 63774 w/e 15/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L692
Works Number 21845
To Service During 04/1918
Taken into Stock 29/03/1924
Withdrawal w/e Sun 10/03/1963 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Service Life 44 yrs, 11 mths , 7 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 8/10/63

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1918
GOR   Gorton on 05/04/1924
DON   Doncaster on 27/05/1945
GOR   Gorton on 25/06/1945
RET   Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 08/07/1945
36B   Mexborough on 27/08/1950
41J   Langwith Junction on 03/09/1961
41A   Sheffield Darnall on 23/09/1962
41H   Staveley (G.C.) on 13/01/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 10/03/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36B Mexborough w/e 27/08/1950
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 5w/e 07/10/1961
ALLOC 41A Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 3w/e 02/02/1963
WDN   on 10/03/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1365)
09/08/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1494)
20/04/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1888)
28/03/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1097)
03/06/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1773)
20/07/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3201)
14/11/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
14/11/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1136)
20/05/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3275)
16/01/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1959)
02/12/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3278)
17/08/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3259)
15/01/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3205)
10/11/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22223)
22/01/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22265)
04/10/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22271)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 15/03/1924 29/03/1924 15 days Light Repair Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6268
 
Gorton Works 31/05/1924 09/08/1924 71 days General Boiler number 1494 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/12/1926 29/01/1927 57 days General    
Gorton Works 12/01/1929 20/04/1929 99 days General Boiler number 1888 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/03/1931 28/03/1931 15 days General Boiler number 1097 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/05/1933 03/06/1933 15 days General Boiler number 1773 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/07/1935 20/07/1935 8 days General Boiler number 3201 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/10/1936 14/11/1936 29 days General Boiler number 1136 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 06/05/1939 20/05/1939 15 days General Boiler number 3275 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/12/1942 16/01/1943 19 days General Boiler number 1959 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/11/1944 02/12/1944 15 days General Boiler number 3278 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/04/1946 27/04/1946 15 days Light Repair Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3774
 
Gorton Works 06/07/1946 17/08/1946 43 days Heavy Boiler number 3259 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/12/1948 15/01/1949 22 days General Boiler number 3205 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63774
 
Gorton Works 13/10/1951 10/11/1951 29 days General Boiler number 22223 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/11/1951 20/11/1951 3 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 18/12/1954 22/01/1955 36 days General Boiler number 22265 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/09/1958 04/10/1958 29 days General Boiler number 22271 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/12/1961 09/12/1961 8 days Light Casual Tender changed
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1868
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21845
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
15/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/03/1924. Dep: 29/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6268
   
29/03/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
05/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
31/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1924. Dep: 09/08/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1494 (Diagram 15)
   
04/12/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1926. Dep: 29/01/1927.    
12/01/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1929. Dep: 20/04/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1888 (Diagram 15)
   
14/03/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1931. Dep: 28/03/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1097 (Diagram 15)
   
20/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1933. Dep: 03/06/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1773 (Diagram 15)
   
13/07/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1935. Dep: 20/07/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3201 (Diagram 15)
   
17/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1936. Dep: 14/11/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1136 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
06/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1939. Dep: 20/05/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3275 (Diagram 15)
   
29/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1942. Dep: 16/01/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1959 (Diagram 15)
   
18/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1944. Dep: 02/12/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3278 (Diagram 15)
   
27/05/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
08/07/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
13/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/04/1946. Dep: 27/04/1946.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3774
   
06/07/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 06/07/1946. Dep: 17/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3259 (Diagram 15)
   
25/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/12/1948. Dep: 15/01/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3205 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63774
   
27/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
13/10/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1951. Dep: 10/11/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22223 (Diagram 15)
   
18/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/11/1951. Dep: 20/11/1951.    
18/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1954. Dep: 22/01/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22265 (Diagram 15)
   
06/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1958. Dep: 04/10/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22271 (Diagram 15)
   
03/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
02/12/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/12/1961. Dep: 09/12/1961.
Work undertaken:
Tender changed
   
23/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
13/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
10/03/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63774 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev