|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 15/03/1924 | 29/03/1924 | 15 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6268 |
||
Gorton Works | 31/05/1924 | 09/08/1924 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 1494 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/12/1926 | 29/01/1927 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 12/01/1929 | 20/04/1929 | 99 days | General | Boiler number 1888 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/03/1931 | 28/03/1931 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1097 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/05/1933 | 03/06/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1773 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/07/1935 | 20/07/1935 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3201 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/10/1936 | 14/11/1936 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1136 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/05/1939 | 20/05/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3275 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/12/1942 | 16/01/1943 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 1959 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/11/1944 | 02/12/1944 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3278 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/04/1946 | 27/04/1946 | 15 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3774 |
||
Gorton Works | 06/07/1946 | 17/08/1946 | 43 days | Heavy | Boiler number 3259 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/12/1948 | 15/01/1949 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3205 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63774 |
||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1951 | 10/11/1951 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22223 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/11/1951 | 20/11/1951 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 18/12/1954 | 22/01/1955 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22265 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/09/1958 | 04/10/1958 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22271 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/12/1961 | 09/12/1961 | 8 days | Light Casual | Tender changed |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1868 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21845 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
15/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/03/1924. Dep: 29/03/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6268 |
||
29/03/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
05/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
31/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1924. Dep: 09/08/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1494 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/12/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1926. Dep: 29/01/1927. | ||
12/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1929. Dep: 20/04/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1888 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1931. Dep: 28/03/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1097 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1933. Dep: 03/06/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1773 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1935. Dep: 20/07/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3201 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1936. Dep: 14/11/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1136 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
06/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1939. Dep: 20/05/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3275 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1942. Dep: 16/01/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1959 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1944. Dep: 02/12/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3278 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/05/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
08/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
13/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/04/1946. Dep: 27/04/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3774 |
||
06/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 06/07/1946. Dep: 17/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3259 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/12/1948. Dep: 15/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3205 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63774 |
||
27/08/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
13/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1951. Dep: 10/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22223 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/11/1951. Dep: 20/11/1951. | ||
18/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1954. Dep: 22/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22265 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1958. Dep: 04/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22271 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
02/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/12/1961. Dep: 09/12/1961. Work undertaken: Tender changed |
||
23/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
13/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) | ||
10/03/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63774 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |