Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 22 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 840 Week
» 17791 Month
» 170744 Year
» 1836120 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1875 m/e 05/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6588   25/06/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3779   29/09/1946
British Railways 63779 w/e 31/12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L692
Works Number 21852
To Service During 05/1918
Taken into Stock 05/07/1927
Withdrawal Fri 13/04/1962 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Service Life 43 yrs, 11 mths , 14 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 14/4/62

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1918
LNG   Langwith Junction on 05/07/1927
MAR   March on 25/11/1936
CAM   Cambridge on 22/12/1947
MEX   Mexborough on 11/01/1950
MEX   Mexborough w/e 14/01/1950
36E   Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 16/07/1961
     Withdrawn on 13/04/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CAM Cambridge w/e 27/12/1947
ALLOC MEX Mexborough w/e 14/01/1950
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 05/08/1961
WDN   on 13/04/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1112)
26/09/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1101)
27/01/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1883)
22/02/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
22/02/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1002)
30/04/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3235)
23/03/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3242)
02/11/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3233)
29/06/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3258)
09/06/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3324)
06/12/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3325)
31/12/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3395)
27/09/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22297)
28/04/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22283)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 02/04/1927 25/06/1927 85 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6588
 
Gorton Works 17/08/1929 21/09/1929 36 days General    
Gorton Works 05/09/1931 26/09/1931 22 days General Boiler number 1101 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/01/1934 27/01/1934 8 days General Boiler number 1883 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/02/1936 22/02/1936 15 days General Boiler number 1002 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 16/04/1938 30/04/1938 15 days General Boiler number 3235 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/03/1940 23/03/1940 15 days General Boiler number 3242 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/10/1940 02/11/1940 8 days Heavy Boiler number 3233 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 01/05/1942 29/06/1942 60 days General Boiler number 3258 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/06/1943 26/06/1943 22 days General    
Gorton Works 19/05/1945 09/06/1945 22 days General Boiler number 3324 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/11/1947 06/12/1947 22 days General Boiler number 3325 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/12/1949 31/12/1949 22 days General Boiler number 3395 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63779
 
Gorton Works 09/01/1950 10/01/1950 2 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 13/09/1952 27/09/1952 15 days General Boiler number 22297 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/10/1952 02/10/1952 2 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 31/03/1956 28/04/1956 29 days General Boiler number 22283 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/10/1958 15/11/1958 22 days Heavy Casual    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1875
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21852
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
02/04/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1927. Dep: 25/06/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6588
   
05/07/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
05/07/1927 To Stock To LNER stock    
17/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1929. Dep: 21/09/1929.    
05/09/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1931. Dep: 26/09/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1101 (Diagram 15)
   
20/01/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1934. Dep: 27/01/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1883 (Diagram 15)
   
08/02/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1936. Dep: 22/02/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1002 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
25/11/1936 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
16/04/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1938. Dep: 30/04/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3235 (Diagram 15)
   
09/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1940. Dep: 23/03/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3242 (Diagram 15)
   
26/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 26/10/1940. Dep: 02/11/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3233 (Diagram 15)
   
01/05/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1942. Dep: 29/06/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3258 (Diagram 15)
   
05/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1943. Dep: 26/06/1943.    
19/05/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1945. Dep: 09/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3324 (Diagram 15)
   
29/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3779    
15/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1947. Dep: 06/12/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3325 (Diagram 15)
   
22/12/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
10/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1949. Dep: 31/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3395 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63779
   
09/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/01/1950. Dep: 10/01/1950.    
11/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
14/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
13/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1952. Dep: 27/09/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22297 (Diagram 15)
   
01/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/10/1952. Dep: 02/10/1952.    
31/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1956. Dep: 28/04/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22283 (Diagram 15)
   
25/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 25/10/1958. Dep: 15/11/1958.    
16/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
13/04/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63779 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev