Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 29 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 847 Week
» 17798 Month
» 170751 Year
» 1836127 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1880 m/e 05/1918
London and North Western Railway 2896 m/e 09/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6589   18/02/1928
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3783   26/05/1946
British Railways 63783 w/e 11/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L692
Works Number 21857
To Service During 05/1918
Taken into Stock 16/02/1928
Withdrawal Sun 09/12/1962 off Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Service Life 44 yrs, 7 mths , 9 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Derby)

Notes
Notes Into Derby for cutting up 7/63

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1918
91LNWR   (on loan)   09/1919
ROD       08/1921
SHF   Sheffield Neepsend on 16/02/1928
RET   Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 24/02/1934
SHF   Sheffield Neepsend on 04/11/1935
STV   Staveley (G.C.) on 29/07/1938
WFD   Woodford Halse on 11/08/1944
SHF   Sheffield Darnall on 03/02/1946
CLK   Colwick on 06/03/1949
CLK   Colwick w/e 12/03/1949
SHF   Sheffield Darnall on 07/08/1949
SHF   Sheffield Darnall w/e 13/08/1949
     Withdrawn on 09/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall m/e 28/02/1946
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 12/03/1949
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall w/e 13/08/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1936)
28/05/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1082)
26/01/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1056)
29/05/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 822)
16/05/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1104)
04/03/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3277)
14/09/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3201)
11/12/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1950)
03/11/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22221)
02/10/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22282)
04/10/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22258)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 19/11/1927 18/02/1928 92 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6589
 
Gorton Works 28/12/1929 25/01/1930 29 days General    
Gorton Works 14/05/1932 28/05/1932 15 days General Boiler number 1082 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/01/1935 26/01/1935 8 days General Boiler number 1056 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/05/1937 29/05/1937 15 days General Boiler number 822 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/11/1939 25/11/1939 15 days General    
Gorton Works 09/05/1942 16/05/1942 8 days General Boiler number 1104 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/02/1944 04/03/1944 13 days General Boiler number 3277 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/08/1946 14/09/1946 22 days General Boiler number 3201 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/11/1948 11/12/1948 22 days General Boiler number 1950 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63783
 
Gorton Works 13/10/1951 03/11/1951 22 days General Boiler number 22221 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/11/1951 10/11/1951 5 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 04/09/1954 02/10/1954 29 days General Boiler number 22282 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/10/1954 15/10/1954 10 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 09/11/1957 07/12/1957 29 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 11/12/1957 14/12/1957 4 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 06/09/1958 04/10/1958 29 days General Boiler number 22258 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/10/1958 17/10/1958 5 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 24/10/1958 28/10/1958 5 days Unclassified    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1880
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21857
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2896    
08/1921 Allocation      
19/11/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1927. Dep: 18/02/1928.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6589
   
16/02/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
16/02/1928 To Stock To LNWR stock    
28/12/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1929. Dep: 25/01/1930.    
14/05/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1932. Dep: 28/05/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1082 (Diagram 15)
   
24/02/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
19/01/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1935. Dep: 26/01/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1056 (Diagram 15)
   
04/11/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
15/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1937. Dep: 29/05/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 822 (Diagram 15)
   
29/07/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
11/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1939. Dep: 25/11/1939.    
09/05/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1942. Dep: 16/05/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1104 (Diagram 15)
   
21/02/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1944. Dep: 04/03/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3277 (Diagram 15)
   
11/08/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
03/02/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
26/05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3783    
24/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1946. Dep: 14/09/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3201 (Diagram 15)
   
20/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1948. Dep: 11/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1950 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63783
   
06/03/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
12/03/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
07/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
13/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
13/10/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1951. Dep: 03/11/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22221 (Diagram 15)
   
06/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/11/1951. Dep: 10/11/1951.    
04/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1954. Dep: 02/10/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22282 (Diagram 15)
   
06/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/10/1954. Dep: 15/10/1954.    
09/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/11/1957. Dep: 07/12/1957.    
11/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/12/1957. Dep: 14/12/1957.    
06/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1958. Dep: 04/10/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22258 (Diagram 15)
   
13/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/10/1958. Dep: 17/10/1958.    
24/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/10/1958. Dep: 28/10/1958.    
09/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63783 from Sheffield Darnall (41A)    

prev prev