Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 35 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 853 Week
» 17804 Month
» 170757 Year
» 1836133 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1881 m/e 05/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6507   26/09/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3784   07/07/1946
British Railways (BR Tmp) E3784   13/03/1948
British Railways 63784 w/e 07/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/305/1918
O1 (2-8-0)24/06/1944
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L692
Works Number 21858
To Service During 05/1918
Taken into Stock 26/09/1925
Withdrawal Thu 29/08/1963 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Service Life 45 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 3/12/63

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1918
GOR   Gorton on 25/09/1925
NWE   New England on 07/10/1925
MEX   Mexborough on 18/10/1928
GOR   Gorton on 20/08/1944
38B   Annesley on 26/11/1950
38B   Annesley m/e 30/11/1950
31B   March on 26/05/1957
41H   Staveley (G.C.) on 06/12/1959
     Withdrawn on 29/08/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38B Annesley m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 15/06/1957
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 26/12/1959
WDN   on 29/08/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1011)
24/01/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1431)
25/08/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 817)
17/07/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3300)
10/10/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3414)
24/06/1944 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5004)
07/09/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5020)
07/08/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5115)
13/01/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28284)
22/11/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28275)
20/11/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28386)
26/01/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28829)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 06/06/1925 26/09/1925 113 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6507
 
Gorton Works 01/09/1928 20/10/1928 50 days General    
Gorton Works 10/01/1931 24/01/1931 15 days General Boiler number 1431 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/08/1934 25/08/1934 15 days General Boiler number 817 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/07/1937 17/07/1937 15 days General Boiler number 3300 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/11/1939 09/12/1939 15 days General    
Gorton Works 23/09/1942 10/10/1942 18 days General Boiler number 3414 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/04/1944 24/06/1944 74 days General Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5004 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 21/10/1944 21/10/1944 1 day Unclassified    
Gorton Works 17/08/1946 07/09/1946 22 days General Boiler number 5020 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 28/02/1948 13/03/1948 15 days Unclassified Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3784
 
Gorton Works 03/07/1948 07/08/1948 36 days General Boiler number 5115 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63784
 
Gorton Works 23/12/1950 13/01/1951 22 days General Boiler number 28284 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 01/11/1952 22/11/1952 22 days General Boiler number 28275 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 16/10/1954 20/11/1954 36 days General Boiler number 28386 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 16/04/1955 16/04/1955 1 day Unclassified    
Gorton Works 05/01/1957 26/01/1957 22 days General Boiler number 28829 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 24/09/1960 29/10/1960 36 days Heavy Intermediate    
Gorton Works 29/04/1961 27/05/1961 29 days Heavy Casual    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1881
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21858
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
06/06/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1925. Dep: 26/09/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6507
   
25/09/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
26/09/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
07/10/1925 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
01/09/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1928. Dep: 20/10/1928.    
18/10/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
10/01/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1931. Dep: 24/01/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1431 (Diagram 15)
   
11/08/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1934. Dep: 25/08/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 817 (Diagram 15)
   
03/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1937. Dep: 17/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3300 (Diagram 15)
   
25/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1939. Dep: 09/12/1939.    
23/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1942. Dep: 10/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3414 (Diagram 15)
   
12/04/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1944. Dep: 24/06/1944.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5004 (Diagram 100A)
   
20/08/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
21/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/10/1944. Dep: 21/10/1944.    
07/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3784    
17/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1946. Dep: 07/09/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5020 (Diagram 100A)
   
28/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/02/1948. Dep: 13/03/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3784
   
03/07/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1948. Dep: 07/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5115 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63784
   
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
23/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1950. Dep: 13/01/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28284 (Diagram 100A)
   
01/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1952. Dep: 22/11/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28275 (Diagram 100A)
   
16/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1954. Dep: 20/11/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28386 (Diagram 100A)
   
16/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/04/1955. Dep: 16/04/1955.    
05/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1957. Dep: 26/01/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28829 (Diagram 100A)
   
26/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
06/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
24/09/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/09/1960. Dep: 29/10/1960.    
29/04/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 29/04/1961. Dep: 27/05/1961.    
29/08/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63784 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev