Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 35 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 853 Week
» 17804 Month
» 170757 Year
» 1836133 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1884 m/e 06/1918
London and North Western Railway 2894 m/e 09/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6515   17/10/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3786   14/07/1946
British Railways 63786 w/e 12/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/306/1918
O1 (2-8-0)18/11/1944
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L692
Works Number 21861
To Service During 06/1918
Taken into Stock 17/10/1925
Withdrawal Sun 27/09/1964 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Service Life 46 yrs, 3 mths , 27 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Disposal
Scrapping T W Ward (Killamarsh)

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to T W Ward, Killamarsh, 11/64

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1918
91LNWR   (on loan)   09/1919
ROD       08/1921
GOR   Gorton on 13/10/1925
IMM   Immingham on 22/10/1925
KEA   Keadby on 11/06/1932
FRO   Frodingham on 12/06/1932
GOR   Gorton on 06/12/1944
38B   Annesley on 27/10/1950
38B   Annesley w/e 28/10/1950
31B   March on 03/03/1957
41H   Staveley (G.C.) on 16/09/1962
     Withdrawn on 27/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 28/10/1950
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   on 27/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1043)
23/11/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1862)
16/04/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1070)
14/04/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 546)
18/07/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
18/07/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3252)
03/09/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1153)
14/12/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3414)
19/09/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3212)
18/11/1944 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5012)
08/03/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5098)
12/02/1949 Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted
12/02/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5018)
22/09/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28345)
03/10/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28812)
10/09/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28367)
14/09/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28132)
14/07/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28234)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 27/06/1925 17/10/1925 113 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6515
 
Gorton Works 07/01/1928 25/02/1928 50 days General    
Gorton Works 26/10/1929 23/11/1929 29 days General Boiler number 1862 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/04/1932 16/04/1932 8 days General Boiler number 1070 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/03/1934 14/04/1934 15 days General Boiler number 546 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/07/1936 18/07/1936 15 days General Boiler number 3252 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 20/08/1938 03/09/1938 15 days General Boiler number 1153 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/11/1940 14/12/1940 15 days General Boiler number 3414 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/09/1942 19/09/1942 11 days General Boiler number 3212 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/09/1944 18/11/1944 75 days General Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5012 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 01/02/1947 08/03/1947 36 days General Boiler number 5098 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 15/01/1949 12/02/1949 29 days General Boiler number 5018 (Diagram 100A)
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted
Renumbered to BR 63786
 
Gorton Works 29/04/1950 06/05/1950 8 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 25/08/1951 22/09/1951 29 days General Boiler number 28345 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 19/09/1953 03/10/1953 15 days General Boiler number 28812 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 30/10/1954 20/11/1954 22 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 06/08/1955 10/09/1955 36 days General Boiler number 28367 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 04/02/1956 11/02/1956 8 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 24/08/1957 14/09/1957 22 days General Boiler number 28132 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 16/01/1960 20/02/1960 36 days Heavy Intermediate    
Gorton Works 06/08/1960 13/08/1960 8 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 23/09/1961 07/10/1961 15 days Light Casual    
Doncaster Works 29/05/1962 14/07/1962 47 days Heavy Casual Boiler number 28234 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1884
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21861
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2894    
08/1921 Allocation      
27/06/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1925. Dep: 17/10/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6515
   
13/10/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
17/10/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
22/10/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
07/01/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1928. Dep: 25/02/1928.    
26/10/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1929. Dep: 23/11/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1862 (Diagram 15)
   
09/04/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1932. Dep: 16/04/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1070 (Diagram 15)
   
11/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
12/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
31/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1934. Dep: 14/04/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 546 (Diagram 15)
   
04/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1936. Dep: 18/07/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3252 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
20/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1938. Dep: 03/09/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1153 (Diagram 15)
   
30/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1940. Dep: 14/12/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3414 (Diagram 15)
   
09/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1942. Dep: 19/09/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3212 (Diagram 15)
   
05/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1944. Dep: 18/11/1944.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5012 (Diagram 100A)
   
06/12/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
14/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3786    
01/02/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1947. Dep: 08/03/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5098 (Diagram 100A)
   
15/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1949. Dep: 12/02/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5018 (Diagram 100A)
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted
Renumbered to BR 63786
   
29/04/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/04/1950. Dep: 06/05/1950.    
27/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
28/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
25/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1951. Dep: 22/09/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28345 (Diagram 100A)
   
19/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1953. Dep: 03/10/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28812 (Diagram 100A)
   
30/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/10/1954. Dep: 20/11/1954.    
06/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1955. Dep: 10/09/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28367 (Diagram 100A)
   
04/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/02/1956. Dep: 11/02/1956.    
03/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
24/08/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1957. Dep: 14/09/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28132 (Diagram 100A)
   
16/01/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/01/1960. Dep: 20/02/1960.    
06/08/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/08/1960. Dep: 13/08/1960.    
23/09/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/09/1961. Dep: 07/10/1961.    
29/05/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 29/05/1962. Dep: 14/07/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28234 (Diagram 100A)
   
16/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
27/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63786 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev