|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 27/06/1925 | 17/10/1925 | 113 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6515 |
||
Gorton Works | 07/01/1928 | 25/02/1928 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 26/10/1929 | 23/11/1929 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1862 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/04/1932 | 16/04/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1070 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/03/1934 | 14/04/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 546 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/07/1936 | 18/07/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3252 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/08/1938 | 03/09/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1153 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/11/1940 | 14/12/1940 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3414 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/09/1942 | 19/09/1942 | 11 days | General | Boiler number 3212 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/09/1944 | 18/11/1944 | 75 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5012 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/02/1947 | 08/03/1947 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 5098 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/01/1949 | 12/02/1949 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 5018 (Diagram 100A) Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted Renumbered to BR 63786 |
||
Gorton Works | 29/04/1950 | 06/05/1950 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 25/08/1951 | 22/09/1951 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28345 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/09/1953 | 03/10/1953 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 28812 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/10/1954 | 20/11/1954 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 06/08/1955 | 10/09/1955 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28367 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/02/1956 | 11/02/1956 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 24/08/1957 | 14/09/1957 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28132 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/01/1960 | 20/02/1960 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 06/08/1960 | 13/08/1960 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 23/09/1961 | 07/10/1961 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/05/1962 | 14/07/1962 | 47 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 28234 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1884 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21861 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/1919 | Allocation | |||
09/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2894 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
27/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1925. Dep: 17/10/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6515 |
||
13/10/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
17/10/1925 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
22/10/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
07/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1928. Dep: 25/02/1928. | ||
26/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1929. Dep: 23/11/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1862 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1932. Dep: 16/04/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1070 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/06/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Keadby (KEA) | ||
12/06/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
31/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1934. Dep: 14/04/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 546 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1936. Dep: 18/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3252 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
20/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1938. Dep: 03/09/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1153 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1940. Dep: 14/12/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3414 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1942. Dep: 19/09/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3212 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1944. Dep: 18/11/1944. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5012 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/12/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
14/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3786 | ||
01/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1947. Dep: 08/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5098 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1949. Dep: 12/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5018 (Diagram 100A) Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted Renumbered to BR 63786 |
||
29/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/04/1950. Dep: 06/05/1950. | ||
27/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
28/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
25/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1951. Dep: 22/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28345 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1953. Dep: 03/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28812 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/10/1954. Dep: 20/11/1954. | ||
06/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1955. Dep: 10/09/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28367 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/02/1956. Dep: 11/02/1956. | ||
03/03/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
24/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1957. Dep: 14/09/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28132 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/01/1960. Dep: 20/02/1960. | ||
06/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/08/1960. Dep: 13/08/1960. | ||
23/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/09/1961. Dep: 07/10/1961. | ||
29/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 29/05/1962. Dep: 14/07/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28234 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) | ||
27/09/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63786 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |