Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 108 Today
» 1120 Yesterday
» 3497 Week
» 22398 Month
» 22398 Year
» 1687774 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1886 m/e 06/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6592   01/10/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3788   12/10/1946
British Railways (BR Tmp) E3788   27/02/1948
British Railways 63788 w/e 02/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/306/1918
O4/5 (2-8-0)17/09/1939
O4/8 (2-8-0)16/03/1957
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L692
Works Number 21863
To Service During 06/1918
Taken into Stock 30/09/1927
Withdrawal Sun 02/01/1966 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 47 yrs, 7 mths , 2 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to T W Ward, Beighton, 2/66

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1918
IMM Immingham on 30/09/1927
DON Doncaster on 21/10/1940
FRO Frodingham on 25/07/1943
36A Doncaster on 10/10/1965
   Withdrawn on 02/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36A Doncaster w/e 16/10/1965
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 06/11/1965
WDN   w/e 02/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1210)
15/07/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 872)
23/02/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1493)
24/07/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3304)
17/09/1939 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 3653)
27/05/1944 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 3652)
12/10/1946 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 3654)
02/04/1949 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 3652)
16/03/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28341)
04/08/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28806)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 20/08/1927 01/10/1927 43 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6592
 
Gorton Works 12/10/1929 09/12/1929 59 days General  
Gorton Works 06/06/1932 15/07/1932 40 days General
Boiler number 872 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/01/1935 23/02/1935 25 days General
Boiler number 1493 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/06/1937 24/07/1937 32 days General
Boiler number 3304 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/07/1939 17/09/1939 55 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/5
Boiler number 3653 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 21/09/1941 08/11/1941 49 days General  
Gorton Works 30/04/1944 27/05/1944 28 days General
Boiler number 22344 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 26/08/1946 12/10/1946 48 days General
Boiler number 3654 (Diagram 15A)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3788
 
Gorton Works 16/06/1947 22/09/1947 99 days Heavy  
Gorton Works 24/02/1948 27/02/1948 4 days Unclassified
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3788
 
Gorton Works 20/02/1949 02/04/1949 42 days General
Boiler number 22344 (Diagram 15A)
Renumbered to BR 63788
 
Gorton Works 27/09/1951 24/11/1951 59 days General  
Gorton Works 27/11/1951 12/12/1951 16 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 09/04/1953 18/04/1953 10 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 22/03/1954 08/05/1954 48 days General  
Gorton Works 03/01/1956 07/01/1956 5 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 31/01/1957 16/03/1957 45 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28341 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 10/06/1959 03/07/1959 24 days HfI  
Gorton Works 23/05/1962 04/08/1962 74 days General
Boiler number 28806 (Diagram 100A)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
06/11/1965 Run-away Pannier tank scrapped 0-6-0PT 3788 was at Stourbridge m.p.d. on 6th November, 1965. This engine has been officially recorded as 'broken up on site' after the derailment at Stourbridge Junc. on 6/9/65 after a run-away. SLS/196602

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1886
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21863
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
30/09/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
30/09/1927 To Stock To ROD stock    
21/10/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
25/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
10/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
02/01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 63788 from Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev