Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 287 Today
» 1097 Yesterday
» 2556 Week
» 21457 Month
» 21457 Year
» 1686833 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1892 m/e 02/1918
London and North Western Railway 2940 m/e 12/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6594   09/06/1928
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3790   26/05/1946
British Railways 63790 w/e 06/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L693
Works Number 21869
To Service During 02/1918
Taken into Stock 07/06/1928
Withdrawal Thu 12/03/1959 off Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 41 yrs, 1 mth , 9 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1918
91LNWR (on loan)   12/1919
ROD     08/1921
DON Doncaster on 07/06/1928
91W To Western Region / GWR (on loan) on 24/11/1940
WFD Woodford Halse on 04/02/1943
GOR Gorton on 10/03/1943
WHL West Hartlepool on 20/03/1943
CLK Colwick on 20/01/1944
DON Doncaster on 23/01/1944
SHF Sheffield Darnall on 25/06/1945
   Withdrawn on 12/03/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 12/03/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1887)
19/12/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1066)
27/01/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1358)
18/04/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number C1469)
26/03/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3233)
27/07/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 867)
13/11/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 512)
28/12/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3380)
06/08/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1852)
05/04/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22258)
26/02/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22173)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 17/03/1928 09/06/1928 85 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6594
 
Gorton Works 01/03/1930 05/04/1930 36 days General  
Gorton Works 05/12/1931 19/12/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 1066 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/01/1934 27/01/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 1358 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/04/1936 18/04/1936 15 days General
Boiler number C1469 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/03/1938 26/03/1938 8 days General
Boiler number 3233 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/07/1940 27/07/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 867 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/10/1943 13/11/1943 16 days General
Boiler number 512 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/11/1946 28/12/1946 36 days General
Boiler number 22226 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/07/1949 06/08/1949 15 days General
Boiler number 1852 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63790
 
Gorton Works 15/03/1952 05/04/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 22258 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/01/1955 26/02/1955 29 days General
Boiler number 22173 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/03/1959 09/03/1959 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1892
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21869
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/1919 Allocation      
12/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2940    
08/1921 Allocation      
07/06/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
07/06/1928 To Stock To LNWR stock    
24/11/1940 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
04/02/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
10/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
20/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
20/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
26/05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3790    
12/03/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63790 from Sheffield Darnall (41A)    

prev prev