Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 194 Today
» 1097 Yesterday
» 2463 Week
» 21364 Month
» 21364 Year
» 1686740 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1894 m/e 02/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6510   30/07/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3791   14/07/1946
British Railways 63791 w/e 24/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/302/1918
O4/8 (2-8-0)06/10/1956
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L693
Works Number 21871
To Service During 02/1918
Taken into Stock 30/07/1925
Withdrawal Sun 05/09/1965 off Frodingham (36C)
Scrapping T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 47 yrs, 7 mths , 5 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to T W Ward, Beighton, 10/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1918
GOR Gorton on 30/07/1925
CLK Colwick on 15/08/1925
DON Doncaster on 23/01/1944
MEX Mexborough on 18/08/1946
36C Frodingham on 10/12/1961
   Withdrawn on 05/09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36D Barnsley 3w/e 30/12/1961
WDN   w/e 05/09/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1180)
15/10/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1869)
03/03/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1066)
07/08/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1129)
14/10/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1046)
04/01/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3343)
12/06/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3408)
12/01/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3208)
28/07/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3300)
02/12/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22137)
11/07/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22101)
06/10/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28372)
13/04/1961 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28362)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 28/05/1925 30/07/1925 64 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6510
 
Gorton Works 18/08/1928 18/10/1928 62 days General  
Gorton Works 29/08/1931 15/10/1931 48 days General
Boiler number 1869 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/01/1934 03/03/1934 37 days General
Boiler number 1066 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/07/1936 07/08/1936 28 days General
Boiler number 1129 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/08/1938 14/10/1938 61 days General
Boiler number 1046 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/12/1940 04/01/1941 29 days General
Boiler number 3343 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 13/03/1943 12/06/1943 92 days General
Boiler number 3408 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/10/1945 12/01/1946 81 days General
Boiler number 3208 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/06/1948 28/07/1948 53 days General
Boiler number 3300 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63791
 
Gorton Works 05/11/1950 02/12/1950 28 days General
Boiler number 22137 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/06/1953 11/07/1953 23 days General
Boiler number 22101 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/08/1956 06/10/1956 50 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28372 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 09/03/1961 13/04/1961 36 days General
Boiler number 28362 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1894
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21871
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
30/07/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
30/07/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
15/08/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
14/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3791    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
10/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
05/09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63791 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev